Global Patent Index - EP 1847660 A2

EP 1847660 A2 2007-10-24 - Roof construction element made of flat roof panels

Title (en)

Roof construction element made of flat roof panels

Title (de)

Dachkonstruktionselement aus Plattendachflächen

Title (fr)

Elément de structure de toit en panneaux plats

Publication

EP 1847660 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07007970 A

Priority

AT 3142006 A

Abstract (en)

The roof construction element (D) is arranged in pairs and interconnected at a first angle with the roof surfaces (1) without the rafters. The roof areas have static load-bearing plates (4) provides a horizontal element (2) to a self - folding part. The horizontal elements are formed as a plate, rod, or rope. External insulation (3) is provided on the roof surfaces. A thermal insulation layer (6) is arranged inside the roof areas.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Dachkonstruktionselement (D) aus Paaren von in einem Firstwinkel (±) miteinander verbundenen Dachflächen (1) ohne Dachsparren, wobei die Dachflächen (1) aus statisch tragenden Platten (4) zusammengesetzt und mit zumindest einem Horizontalelement (2) zu einem freitragenden Faltwerk verbunden sind.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/24 (2006.01); E04B 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847660 A2 20071024; EP 1847660 A3 20120530

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121204

2013-02-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2012-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04B 7/02 20060101ALI20120423BHEP

2012-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04B 7/24 20060101AFI20120423BHEP

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU