Global Patent Index - EP 1847668 A2

EP 1847668 A2 2007-10-24 - Adjustable tension type of sunshade awning

Title (en)

Adjustable tension type of sunshade awning

Title (de)

Sonnenschutzplane mit einstellbarer Spannung

Title (fr)

Installation d'extraction de l'heure de l'unité centrale

Publication

EP 1847668 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06126652 A

Priority

CN 200620102718 U

Abstract (en)

An adjustable tension type of sunshade awning comprising standing poles (1), standing pole bases (2), top poles (4) and a tarpaulin (5), characterized in that each of four top poles is attached to the center joint at one end and to a standing pole at the other end so as to form the structural frame, a stretching device is provided at the end of the top pole at which the top pole is attached to the standing pole, the stretching device is provided with a latch hook, and a steel cable (14) passing through the hemmed edge of the tarpaulin is tied on the latch hook. When a person finds the tarpaulin loses its tension, he can wrench the locking screw (8) in the stretching device to make the sleeve pull tautly the steel cable outward in opposite direction in order to stretch the tarpaulin, and the tension of the tarpaulin can be kept by means of the self-locking action of the thread. The present invention has the characteristics of simple structure, easy adjustment and good integration.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/322 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847668 A2 20071024; EP 1847668 A3 20090603; AU 2006100727 A4 20060921; CA 2559336 A1 20071017; CN 2908689 Y 20070606; HK 1102989 A2 20071214; US 2007240746 A1 20071018

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091204

2010-03-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-02-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-06-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU