Global Patent Index - EP 1847717 A2

EP 1847717 A2 2007-10-24 - Housing for a radial fan

Title (en)

Housing for a radial fan

Title (de)

Gehäuse für Radialgebläse

Title (fr)

Boîtier pour soufflante radiale

Publication

EP 1847717 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07006905 A

Priority

DE 102006019177 A

Abstract (en)

An automotive air conditioning system has a radial air blower with an axial widening of the spiral drum housing. One side face of the spiral housing (3) is at right angles to the rotor axis and has two parallel zones (7, 8) that are transposed to each other by a constant height dimension along the axis of rotation. The ratio of transposition is between 0.05 and 0.7.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Trommelläufer-Radialgebläse (1) mit axialer Erweiterung des Spiralgehäuses, wobei mindestens eine Seitenfläche des Spiralgehäuses (3), die senkrecht zur Drehachse (A) des Rotors (2) angeordnet ist, mindestens zwei parallel zueinander angeordnete Bereiche (7 und 8) aufweist, die in Längsrichtung der Drehachse (A) zueinander um eine konstante Höhe (x) in Abhängigkeit des Rotorradius (R) versetzt sind.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/4233 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847717 A2 20071024; EP 1847717 A3 20120516; EP 1847717 B1 20131106; DE 102006019177 A1 20071025

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170503

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-01-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES

- Effective date: 20140806

2016-04-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-04-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAHLE INTERNATIONAL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BEHR GMBH & CO. KG, 70469 STUTTGART, DE

- Document: DE 502007012450

- Effective date: 20150324

2015-04-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007012450

- Representative's name: GRAUEL, ANDREAS, DIPL.-PHYS. DR. RER. NAT., DE

- Effective date: 20150324

2015-03-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MAHLE BEHR GMBH & CO. KG

2015-03-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007012450

- Representative's name: GRAUEL, ANDREAS, DIPL.-PHYS. DR. RER. NAT., DE

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140403

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140403

2014-10-16 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 502007012450

- Effective date: 20140806

2014-09-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES

- Effective date: 20140806

2014-08-06 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 502007012450

2013-12-24 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007012450

- Effective date: 20131224

2013-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2013-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2013-06-19 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130524

2013-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2012-12-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20121116

2012-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2012-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04D 29/42 20060101AFI20120411BHEP

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU