Global Patent Index - EP 1847766 A1

EP 1847766 A1 2007-10-24 - Indoor lighting device

Title (en)

Indoor lighting device

Title (de)

Innenraumleuchte

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'éclairage intérieur

Publication

EP 1847766 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06008000 A

Priority

EP 06008000 A

Abstract (en)

The light has light guiding chambers (6, 7) provided on sides of a centrically carrier hollow section (1) and laterally to fluorescent lamps (2, 3). The chambers are closed by a space-sided light exit surface. Cover-sided light distribution airfoils (8) are swivelably and/or detachably supported at the carrier hollow section, where shape, size, position and/or inclination of the airfoils are selectable relative to a vertical centre plane of the carrier hollow section depending on the respective distance of a light to a cover (12).

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine insbesondere als Innenraumleuchte verwendbare Leuchte (15) in Flachbauweise beschrieben, die raum- und/oder deckenseitig gelegene Lichtaustrittsflächen, ein mittig und zwischen zwei Endteilen angeordnetes Trägerhohlprofil (1) mit außenliegenden konkaven Reflexionsflächen für zwei zum Trägerprofil benachbarte Leuchtstofflampen (2,3) aufweist, wobei deckenseitig am Trägerhohlprofil oder einem mit dem Trägerhohlprofil (1) kuppelbaren Abdeckprofil (5) gelagerte Lichtverteilungsflügel (8) vorgesehen sind, wobei deckenseitig am Trägerhohlprofil schwenk- und/oder lösbar gelagerte Lichtverteilungsflügel (8) vorgesehen sind, deren Form und/oder Größe sowie deren Position und/oder Neigung relativ zur vertikalen Mittelebene des Trägerhohlprofils insbesondere in Abhängigkeit vom jeweiligen Abstand der Leuchte (15) zur Decke (12) wählbar ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 14/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/0016 (2013.01); F21S 8/06 (2013.01); F21V 7/005 (2013.01); F21V 15/013 (2013.01); F21V 17/02 (2013.01); F21V 13/04 (2013.01); F21V 23/02 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2113/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847766 A1 20071024

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080425

2008-08-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-11-21 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 0100 ZUMTOBEL LIGHTING GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20071024

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU