Global Patent Index - EP 1847768 A2

EP 1847768 A2 2007-10-24 - Lighting apparatus with high light diffusion

Title (en)

Lighting apparatus with high light diffusion

Title (de)

Beleuchtungsgerät mit hoher Lichtdiffusion

Title (fr)

Appareil d'éclairage avec une grande diffusion de la lumière

Publication

EP 1847768 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07105917 A

Priority

IT MI20060144 U

Abstract (en)

A lighting apparatus (10) with high light diffusion, comprising a box-shaped main body (12) open on one side, inside of which at least one light source (14) is housed and on the open side of which a diffusing screen (16) is arranged. The diffusing screen (16) is fixed to a support structure (20) able to be attached to the box-shaped body (12), so that the perimetric portion of the support structure (20) substantially coincides with the perimetric walls of the box-shaped body (12).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/16 (2006.01); F21V 15/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/162 (2013.01); F21V 15/01 (2013.01); F21V 1/14 (2013.01); F21V 3/02 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847768 A2 20071024; EP 1847768 A3 20080213; CN 101059221 A 20071024; IT MI20060144 U1 20071022; NO 20071990 A 20071022

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081015

2008-10-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080604

2008-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080326

2008-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU