Global Patent Index - EP 1847784 A1

EP 1847784 A1 2007-10-24 - Heating device with thin heating boards

Title (en)

Heating device with thin heating boards

Title (de)

Heizgerät mit dünnen Heizplatten

Title (fr)

Appareil de chauffage avec des plaques chauffantes minces

Publication

EP 1847784 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06252124 A

Priority

EP 06252124 A

Abstract (en)

A heating device includes a case having a plurality of openings and a plurality of slits are defined in bars of the case so that a plurality of heating boards are engaged with the slits of the case at an equal distance. A power control device is connected to the case and includes a power line having a plurality of male connectors. Each heating board includes a heating layer sandwiched between two isolation plates. Two wires are connected to the heating layer and each wire has female connectors, which are connected with the male connectors of the power line. The heating layers of the heating boards dispense heat evenly from the openings of the case.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 3/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847784 A1 20071024

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081023

2008-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080612

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080312

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU