Global Patent Index - EP 1847794 A1

EP 1847794 A1 2007-10-24 - Front shaft repeater

Title (en)

Front shaft repeater

Title (de)

Vorderschaftsrepetierer

Title (fr)

Répétiteur de crosse avant

Publication

EP 1847794 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07008099 A

Priority

DE 202006006616 U

Abstract (en)

The pump gun (10) has a sliding front stock (12) which is coupled to the lock by a reversing gear so that, when the sliding stock is moved in one direction the lock is moved in the opposite direction. When closed the lock is against the rear end (21) of the stock.

Abstract (de)

Ein Vorderschaftrepetierer (10) hat einen Lauf (11), einen Schafthauptteil (12), einen längsverschieblich gelagerten Vorderschaft (12) und eine mit diesem gekoppelte Verschlussvorrichtung (17), welche in Schließstellung des Repetierers (10) mit dem rückwärtigen Laufende (21) in Eingriff bringbar ist. Dabei sind die Verschlussvorrichtung (17) und der Vorderschaft (12) derart gekoppelt, dass beim Verschieben des Vorderschafts (12) die Verschlussvorrichtung (17) entgegengesetzt zur Verschiebungsrichtung des Vorderschafts (12) betätigbar ist. Hierdurch wird erreicht, dass der Vorderschaftrepetierer (10) ohne Arretierungsvorrichtung sicher zu handhaben ist und im schussbereiten Ausgangszustand keine Repetierhublücke aufweist. Weiterhin wird eine auf die Ergonomie des Schützen abgestimmte Waffe geschaffen, die in geschlossenem bzw. schussbereitem Zustand ein gefälliges Erscheinungsbild aufweist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41C 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41C 7/04 (2013.01); F41C 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0692696 B1 19990728 - BROWNING SA [BE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

DE 202006006616 U1 20070906; EP 1847794 A1 20071024; US 2008168694 A1 20080717; US 7526887 B2 20090505

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081007

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080526

2008-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080418

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU