Global Patent Index - EP 1847970 A2

EP 1847970 A2 2007-10-24 - Electronic key for a locking system of a motor vehicle with a housing

Title (en)

Electronic key for a locking system of a motor vehicle with a housing

Title (de)

Elektronischer Schlüssel für ein Schließsystem eines Kraftfahrzeugs mit einem Gehäuse

Title (fr)

Clef électronique pour un système de verrouillage d'un véhicule automobile avec un boîtier

Publication

EP 1847970 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07007736 A

Priority

  • DE 102006018196 A
  • DE 102006018197 A
  • DE 102006018201 A
  • DE 102006018202 A
  • DE 102006018195 A

Abstract (en)

The housing (9) has two housing parts (9a,9b), and a transmitter (17) present in the housing for electromagnetic signal. The housing part is made up permeable material for the electromagnetic radiation (46) particularly for infrared radiation. The housing has an operating organ, where operating organ has a switching element like an electrical switch, a sensor, and the operating organ affects the operation of the switching element.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Gehäuse (9), insbesondere für einen elektronischen Schlüssel eines Schließsystems eines Kraftfahrzeugs, das aus wenigstens zwei Gehäuseteilen (9a, 9b) besteht. Das Gehäuse (9) weist ein Betätigungsorgan für ein Schaltelement, wie einen elektrischen Schalter, einen Sensor o. dgl., auf, wobei das Betätigungsorgan auf das Schaltelement betätigend einwirkt. Das Betätigungsorgan ist insbesondere in der Art einer zur Betätigung elastisch verformbaren, gegebenenfalls im wesentlichen in der Oberfläche des Gehäuseteils verlaufenden Fläche ausgestaltet. Bei Betätigung des Schaltelements wird ein Signal aus elektromagnetischer Strahlung (46) von einem im Gehäuse (9) befindlichen Sender (17) gesendet. Das eine Gehäuseteil (9b) ist wenigstens teilweise aus einem für die elektromagnetische Strahlung (46) im wesentlichen durchlässigen Material hergestellt.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/02 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00944 (2013.01); H01H 9/0235 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00785 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00952 (2013.01); H01H 9/04 (2013.01); H01H 13/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847970 A2 20071024; EP 1847970 A3 20081105

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-06 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20151013

2012-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01H 9/02 20060101AFI20120309BHEP

2012-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07C 9/00 20060101ALI20120309BHEP

2012-04-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ELECTRONIC KEY FOR A LOCKING SYSTEM OF A MOTOR VEHICLE WITH A HOUSING

2009-07-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090309

2009-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090122

2008-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2008-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07C 9/00 20060101AFI20070712BHEP

2008-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01H 9/00 20060101ALI20080930BHEP

2008-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H05K 5/00 20060101ALI20080930BHEP

2008-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60R 25/00 20060101ALI20080930BHEP

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU