Global Patent Index - EP 1847973 A2

EP 1847973 A2 2007-10-24 - Safety system

Title (en)

Safety system

Title (de)

Sicherheitssystem

Title (fr)

Système de sécurité

Publication

EP 1847973 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07106754 A

Priority

NL 1031665 A

Abstract (en)

An object to be safeguarded in the form of a house 3 is connected to a security system 1. There is a movement detector 5 in the house, which is connected to a communication unit 7. In the event of a burglary, the movement detector will detect a movement upon which the communication unit will send an alarm signal. The security system 1 also comprises a control device 9 (mobile telephone), to receive the alarm signal and send an action signal to an alarm device 11. If the owner of the house receives the alarm signal, he can use the control device 9 to send an action signal immediately to the alarm device 11 or he can first check if it is a false alarm. If the alarm device 11 receives an action signal from a control device, it will search for which safeguarded object it refers to and which authorities have to be warned. This security system can therefore warn the correct authorities quickly and efficiently.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/08 (2006.01); G08B 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/009 (2013.01); G08B 25/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1847973 A2 20071024; EP 1847973 A3 20071107; NL 1031665 C1 20071023

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-05 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20131026

2013-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ACHMEA SERVICES N.V.

2012-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ACHMEA SERVICES N.V.

2011-06-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS FOR SURE B.V.

2011-06-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOEMANS, AD

2009-03-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090216

2008-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080825

2008-10-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-11-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G08B 25/08 20060101AFI20070918BHEP

2007-11-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G08B 25/00 20060101ALI20071002BHEP

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU