Global Patent Index - EP 1848049 A1

EP 1848049 A1 2007-10-24 - Light emitting device

Title (en)

Light emitting device

Title (de)

Lichtemittierendes Bauelement

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'émission de lumière

Publication

EP 1848049 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06009302 A

Priority

  • EP 06008082 A
  • EP 06009302 A

Abstract (en)

The light emitting diode comprises an arrangement of layers on a substrate (1) comprising an anode (2)- and a cathode contact, which are electrically contacted with a light emitting layer pile arranged between the anode- and the cathode contact, which on its part comprises of a polymer layer (4) and a low-molecular layer out of small molecules of an organic material separable by means of a vacuum evaporation. The small molecules are built as donor molecules with an oxidation potential in comparison to Fc/Fc +> (ferrocene/ferrocenium redox pair) of a maximum of -2.2 V. The light emitting diode comprises an arrangement of layers on a substrate (1) comprising an anode (2)- and a cathode contact, which are electrically contacted with a light emitting layer pile arranged between the anode- and the cathode contact, which on its part comprises of a polymer layer (4) and a low-molecular layer out of small molecules of an organic material separable by means of a vacuum evaporation. The small molecules are built as donor molecules with an oxidation potential in comparison to Fc/Fc +> (ferrocene/ferrocenium redox pair) of a maximum of -2.2 V, if the low-molecular layer is arranged adjacent to the cathode contact, and as acceptor molecules with a reduction potential in comparison to the Fc/Fc +> of -0.24 V, if the low-molecular layer is arranged adjacent to the anode contact. The light emitting layer pile comprises a further low-molecular layer made out of small molecules of a further organic material separable by means of vacuum evaporation. The small molecules of the further low-molecular layer is built as acceptor molecules with an oxidation potential of maximum of -0.24 V, in comparison to Fc/Fc +>, if the further low-molecular layer is arranged adjacent to the anode contact and the low-molecular layer is arranged adjacent to the cathode contact, and as donor molecules with a reduction potential in comparison to Fc/Fc +> of -2.2 V, if the further low-molecular layer is arranged adjacent to the anode contact and the low-molecular layer is arranged adjacent to the cathode contact. The donor molecules and/or the acceptor molecules have a molar mass of 200-1000g/mol. The low-molecular and/or the further low-molecular layer have a layer thickness 1-5 nm. The polymer layer is a light emitting and a charge carrier transporting layer and has a layer thickness of 50-100 nm. Between the anode contact and the polymer layer a polymer hole injection layer (3) with a thickness of 50-100 nm is arranged, if the low-molecular layer is arranged adjacent to the cathode contact. Between the low-molecular layer and the polymer layer a low-molecular organic electron transport layer (6) with a thickness of 20-100 nm is arranged, if the low-molecular layer is arranged adjacent to the cathode contact. The low-molecular organic electron transport layer comprises an organic matrix material, which is electrically doped with a low-molecular organic donor material and consists of a doping concentration (donor material molecules: matrix material molecule) of 1:100-1:10. The organic donor material has a molar mass of 200-1000g/mol. Between the low-molecular layer and the polymer layer a low-molecular organic block layer with a thickness of 5-20 nm is arranged, if the low-molecular layer is arranged adjacent to the cathode contact. Between the cathode contact and the polymer layer a polymer electron injection layer with a thickness of 50-100 nm is arranged, if the low-molecular layer is arranged adjacent to the anode contact. Between the low-molecular layer and the polymer layer a low-molecular organic hole transporting layer with a thickness of 20-100 nm is arranged, if the low-molecular layer is arranged adjacent to the anode contact. The low-molecular organic hole transport layer comprises an organic matrix material, which is electronically doped with a low-molecular organic acceptor material and has a doping concentration (acceptor molecule: matrix-material molecule) of 1:100-1:10. The organic acceptor material has a molecular mass of 200-1000g/mol. Between the low-molecular layer and the polymer layer a further low-molecular organic block layer with a thickness of 5-20 nm is arranged, if the low-molecular layer is arranged adjacent to the anode contact. The arrangement of layers is constructed as inverted design, non-inverted design, light that is generated in the light emitting layer pile, design that emits away from the substrate (top-emission) and light that is generated in the light emitting layer pile, through a substrate emitting design (bottom-emission). The arrangement of layers is transparent with the substrate. A base contact and a cover contact are intended, which are built by means of the anode contact or the cathode contact.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein lichtemittierendes Bauelement, insbesondere Leuchtdiode, mit einer Anordnung von Schichten auf einem Substrat, wobei die Anordnung von Schichten einen Anodenkontakt und einen Kathodenkontakt aufweist, die mit einem zwischen dem Anodenkontakt und dem Kathodenkontakt angeordneten, lichtemittierenden Schichtstapel in elektrischem Kontakt sind, welcher seinerseits eine polymere Schicht aus einem Polymermaterial und eine niedermolekulare Schicht mit im Vakuum aufgebrachten kleinen Molekülen eines organischen Materials umfaßt, und wobei die kleinen Moleküle der niedermolekularen Schicht gebildet sind als Donatormoleküle mit einem Oxidationspotential gegenüber Fc / Fc + (Ferrocen / Ferrocenium Redoxpaar) von höchstens etwa -1.5V, wenn die niedermolekulare Schicht benachbart zu dem Kathodenkontakt angeordnet ist, und als Akzeptormoleküle mit einem Reduktionspotential gegenüber Fc / Fc + (Ferrocen / Ferrocenium Redoxpaar) von mindestens etwa -0.3V, wenn die niedermolekulare Schicht benachbart zu dem Anodenkontakt angeordnet ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 51/50 (2006.01); H01L 51/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 51/5088 (2013.01); H01L 51/0051 (2013.01); H01L 51/0084 (2013.01); H01L 51/5092 (2013.01); H01L 51/0037 (2013.01); H01L 51/0038 (2013.01); H01L 51/0077 (2013.01); H01L 51/0079 (2013.01); H01L 51/0085 (2013.01); H01L 51/5052 (2013.01); H01L 51/5096 (2013.01); H01L 2251/554 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • US 6908783 B1 20050621 - KUEHL OLAF [DE], et al
  • US 2003020073 A1 20030130 - LONG KE [US], et al
  • WO 2005086251 A2 20050915 - NOVALED GMBH [DE], et al
  • EP 1511094 A2 20050302 - NOVALED GMBH [DE]
  • KOCH ET AL.: "Optimized Hole Injection with Strong Electron. Acceptors at Organic-Metal Interfaces", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, vol. 95, 2005, pages 237601 - 1
  • HE ET AL.: "ery high-efficiencv and low voltage phosphorescent organic light-emitting diodes based on a p-i-n junction", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 95, no. 10, 2004, pages 5773 - 5777

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 2005086251 A2 20050915 - NOVALED GMBH [DE], et al
  • [Y] EP 1511094 A2 20050302 - NOVALED GMBH [DE]
  • [A] COTTON F A ET AL: "Closed-shell molecules that ionize more readily than cesium", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, vol. 298, no. 5600, 6 December 2002 (2002-12-06), pages 1971 - 1974, XP002330163, ISSN: 0036-8075

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1848049 A1 20071024; EP 1848049 B1 20091209; JP 2009534816 A 20090924; JP 5254208 B2 20130807; KR 101386657 B1 20140417; KR 20090009252 A 20090122; TW 200803005 A 20080101; TW I460898 B 20141111; US 2010065825 A1 20100318; US 8569743 B2 20131029; WO 2007121877 A1 20071101

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170505

2018-03-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180131

2018-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170505

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-04-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100910

2010-01-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006005578 P 20100121

2009-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-12-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-07-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 51/50 20060101AFI20090609BHEP

2009-07-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 51/54 20060101ALI20090609BHEP

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070201

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU