Global Patent Index - EP 1848059 A1

EP 1848059 A1 2007-10-24 - Non-reciprocal circuit device, communication equipment using the same, and method for assembling the non-reciprocal circuit device

Title (en)

Non-reciprocal circuit device, communication equipment using the same, and method for assembling the non-reciprocal circuit device

Title (de)

Nichtreziproke Schaltungsanordnung, damit versehene Kommunikationsvorrichtung, und Verfahren für den Zusammenbau der nichtreziproken Schaltungsanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de circuit non réciproque, équipement de communication l'utilisant, et procédé pour l'assemblage du dispositif de circuit non réciproque

Publication

EP 1848059 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07251617 A

Priority

JP 2006113226 A

Abstract (en)

A non-reciprocal circuit device includes a holder and a gyromagnetic component assembly (1). The holder includes a casing member (3) and a lid member (4). The casing member (3) has a bottom plate (34) and a plurality of side walls (31-33) spaced apart from each other and rising from a periphery of the bottom plate (34), each side wall (31-33) having a depression (36) in an edge opposed to another side wall in a direction of the periphery. The lid member (4) has a top plate (44) and a plurality of side walls (41-43) spaced apart from each other and hanging from a periphery of the top plate (44), each side wall (41-43) having a projection (46) on an edge opposed to another side wall in a direction of the periphery. The lid member (4) is coupled to the casing member (3) with the projection (46) fitted in the depression (36). The gyromagnetic component assembly (1) is housed in the holder between the top plate (44) and the bottom plate (34). When the projection (46) is fitted in the depression (36),a top plate-side end face (461) of the projection (46) is at least partially pressed against an opposing inner face (361) of the depression (36) while a bottom plate-side end face (462) of the projection (46) is spaced apart from an opposing inner face (362) of the depression (36).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/387 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/387 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1848059 A1 20071024; EP 1848059 B1 20090408; CN 101060187 A 20071024; CN 101060187 B 20120711; DE 602007000836 D1 20090520; JP 2007288486 A 20071101; JP 3867991 B1 20070117

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170411

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100111

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 3

2009-05-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602007000836 P 20090520

2009-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-04-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-02-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071221

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU