Global Patent Index - EP 1848264 A1

EP 1848264 A1 2007-10-31 - PLANT GUARD

Title (en)

PLANT GUARD

Title (de)

PFLANZENSCHUTZ

Title (fr)

PROTECTION POUR PLANTE

Publication

EP 1848264 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06741069 A

Priority

  • AU 2006000061 W
  • AU 2005900255 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006089344A1] The present invention relates to a plant guard (10) that can be readily adapted to protect aud nurture the development and growth of a wide variety of plants of different sizes and stages of advancement. The plant guard (10) comprising a body (11) positionable to at least partially surround a plant and configured to contain a volume of liquid for delivery to the plant. The body (11) comprises a first edge (12); a second edge (13); a first end (14); aud a second end (14); wherein ths first end and the second end are configured such that when the first end is positioned proximal said second end or proximal a first or second end of an adjacent plant guard, connection between said proximally positioned ends is facilitated.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01G 13/00 (2006.01); A01G 13/02 (2006.01); A01G 13/10 (2006.01); A01G 27/02 (2006.01); A01G 27/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01G 27/02 (2013.01); A01G 13/0243 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006089344 A1 20060831; WO 2006089344 A8 20061026; EP 1848264 A1 20071031; EP 1848264 A4 20080521

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120801

2009-03-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090209

2008-05-21 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080417

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070820

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR