Global Patent Index - EP 1848304 A1

EP 1848304 A1 2007-10-31 - MULTI-FUNCTIONAL CHILD CARE STORAGE

Title (en)

MULTI-FUNCTIONAL CHILD CARE STORAGE

Title (de)

MULTIFUNKTIONALES SYSTEM ZUR AUFBEWAHRUNG VON KINDERPFLEGEARTIKELN

Title (fr)

RANGEMENT MULTI-FONCTIONNEL POUR SERVICES DE PUERICULTURE

Publication

EP 1848304 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 05822243 A

Priority

  • KR 2005004375 W
  • KR 20040110363 A
  • KR 20040110422 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2006130492A1] A multi-functional child care storage includes a plurality of functional parts partitioned by partitions. The plurality of the functional parts include a refrigerating/heating compartment for keeping therein an infant product and/or a child care product at a proper temperature; and a sterilizing/drying compartment for sterilizing, drying and keeping the infant product and/or the child care product hygienically. The refrigerating/ heating compartment includes a thermoelectric element; a heat absorbing/radiating plate connected to the thermoelectric element, for selectively absorbing or radiating heat; and a temperature sensor for detecting an indoor temperature. The sterilizing/drying compartment includes an ultraviolet germicidal lamp for irradiating ultraviolet rays into an inner space of the sterilizing/drying compartment; and a heat radiation device for discharging hot air to dry the inner space of the sterilizing/drying compartment.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47D 13/00 (2006.01); A47J 36/24 (2006.01); F25D 23/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 6/12 (2013.01); A47J 36/2433 (2013.01); A47J 39/003 (2013.01); F25D 23/12 (2013.01); F25D 31/005 (2013.01); F24F 2006/125 (2013.01); F25B 21/04 (2013.01); F25B 2321/0251 (2013.01); F25D 2317/041 (2013.01); Y02B 30/80 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006068389A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

US 2006130492 A1 20060622; EP 1848304 A1 20071031; JP 2008525099 A 20080717; WO 2006068389 A1 20060629

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-03-26 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080212

2008-02-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2007-12-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PARK, YOON HEELEGAL TEAM OF DAEWOO ELECTRONICS COR

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL