Global Patent Index - EP 1848351 A2

EP 1848351 A2 2007-10-31 - PERCUTANEOUS SPINAL IMPLANTS AND METHODS

Title (en)

PERCUTANEOUS SPINAL IMPLANTS AND METHODS

Title (de)

PERKUTANE WIRBELSÄULENIMPLANTATE UND VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

IMPLANTS VERTEBRAUX PERCUTANES ET METHODES ASSOCIEES

Publication

EP 1848351 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06735305 A

Priority

  • US 2006005580 W
  • US 5952605 A
  • US 25287905 A
  • US 25288005 A
  • US 69583605 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006089085A2] An apparatus includes an elongate member having a proximal portion configured to be deformed from a first configuration to a second configuration. The elongate member has a distal portion configured to be deformed from a first configuration to a second configuration. A non-expanding central portion is positioned between the proximal portion and the distal portion. The non-expanding central portion is configured to engage adjacent spinous processes. An apparatus includes a first clamp having a first end and a second end. The second end of the first clamp is configured to engage a first spinous process. A second clamp has a first end and a second end. The second end of the second clamp is configured to engage a second spinous process spaced apart from the first spinous process. A connector is coupled to the first end of the first clamp and the first end of the second clamp.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/56 (2006.01); A61B 17/02 (2006.01); A61B 17/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/025 (2013.01); A61B 17/7065 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00557 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0256 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006089085 A2 20060824; WO 2006089085 A3 20070111; AU 2006214169 A1 20060824; CA 2597923 A1 20060824; CN 102151169 A 20110817; EP 1848351 A2 20071031; EP 1848351 A4 20120314; IL 185190 D0 20071203; JP 2008529737 A 20080807; JP 4977038 B2 20120718; KR 101119264 B1 20120412; KR 20070112186 A 20071122; KR 20100031774 A 20100324; MX 2007009883 A 20070926

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-23 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120417

2012-03-14 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20120213

2012-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 17/56 20060101AFI20120207BHEP

2012-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 17/02 20060101ALI20120207BHEP

2012-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 17/70 20060101ALI20120207BHEP

2009-03-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KYPHON SARL

2008-05-21 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOHM, ANDREW

2007-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VANDERVELDE, ROBERT, ALEXANDER

2007-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MALANDAIN, HUGUES, F.

2007-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EDIDIN, AVRAM, ALLAN

2007-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SLATER, THOMAS, A.

2007-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CLARK, JANNA, G.

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070824

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR