Global Patent Index - EP 1848364 A2

EP 1848364 A2 2007-10-31 - MIXING DEVICE

Title (en)

MIXING DEVICE

Title (de)

MISCHVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

MELANGEUR

Publication

EP 1848364 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 06706759 A

Priority

  • EP 2006001119 W
  • DE 102005006883 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US7748526B2] The invention relates to a mixing device with a first chamber (1) for a first component, in particular a powder [a liquid], a second chamber (12) for a second component, in particular a liquid [powder], and a divider means (11, 13) separating the first and the second chamber. The second chamber is defined by an inner hollow cylinder (10) which is arranged so as to be moved in a piston-like fashion in an outer hollow body (2) defining the first chamber. According to the invention, the first chamber comprises an evacuation opening (5) which is adapted to be connected with a vacuum source. The invention further relates to a method for vacuum packaging the mixing device.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61C 5/06 (2006.01); B65D 85/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/3255 (2013.01); A61C 5/62 (2017.02); A61C 5/66 (2017.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005006883 A1 20060824; AU 2006215866 A1 20060824; AU 2006215866 A2 20060824; AU 2006215866 B2 20110609; BR PI0607429 A2 20090908; EP 1848364 A2 20071031; JP 2008529623 A 20080807; JP 4871299 B2 20120208; TW 200631651 A 20060916; TW I361108 B 20120401; US 2008149502 A1 20080626; US 7748526 B2 20100706; WO 2006087128 A2 20060824; WO 2006087128 A3 20061019

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130118

2012-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120907

2008-05-21 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-03-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070809

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI