Global Patent Index - EP 1848411 A2

EP 1848411 A2 2007-10-31 - COPOLYHYDROXYALKYLGLUTAMINES WHICH ARE FUNCTIONALISED WITH HYDROPHOBIC GROUPS AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF, SUCH AS IN THERAPEUTICS

Title (en)

COPOLYHYDROXYALKYLGLUTAMINES WHICH ARE FUNCTIONALISED WITH HYDROPHOBIC GROUPS AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF, SUCH AS IN THERAPEUTICS

Title (de)

MIT HYDROPHOBEN GRUPPEN FUNKTIONALISIERTE COPOLYHYDROXYALKYLGLUTAMINE UND DEREN ANWENDUNGEN, BEISPIELSWEISE IN THERAPEUTIKA

Title (fr)

COPOLYHYDROXYALKYLGLUTAMINES FONCTIONNALISES PAR DES GROUPEMENTS HYDROPHOBES ET LEURS APPLICATIONS NOTAMMENT THERAPEUTIQUES

Publication

EP 1848411 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 06707793 A

Priority

  • EP 2006050369 W
  • FR 0550231 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2881140A1] Co-poly(hydroxyglutamine) (A) comprising many, same or different, pendant hydrophobic groups (HG) is new. An independent claim is also included for: (1) Composition comprising (A) with pendant hydrophobic groups and at least one active agent; (2) Preparation of a composition of (A) comprising reacting poly(L-glutamic acid) (Y) with isobutyl chloroformate, and simultaneously or sequentially, reacting with a compound that introduces HG, and a compound that introduces hydroxyalkylamino. Alternatively, (Y) is reacted first with a HG-containing compound and then with isobutyl chloroformate and hydroxyalkylamine, and HG is grafted on to the hydroxy groups of a poly(alkyl-L-glutamate) alkylamide.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/51 (2006.01); C08G 69/10 (2006.01); C08G 73/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/88 (2013.01); A61Q 19/00 (2013.01); C08G 69/10 (2013.01); C08G 69/48 (2013.01); C08L 77/04 (2013.01); A61K 2800/57 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006079614A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

FR 2881140 A1 20060728; FR 2881140 B1 20070406; AU 2006208739 A1 20060803; BR PI0607130 A2 20090804; CA 2596147 A1 20060803; CN 101151023 A 20080326; EP 1848411 A2 20071031; IL 184863 D0 20071203; JP 2008528543 A 20080731; KR 20070101337 A 20071016; MX 2007009029 A 20071002; US 2011044930 A1 20110224; WO 2006079614 A2 20060803; WO 2006079614 A3 20070621; ZA 200707079 B 20081231

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140801

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SOULA, REMI

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHAN, YOU-PING

2007-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071122

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070821

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU