Global Patent Index - EP 1848429 A1

EP 1848429 A1 2007-10-31 - PHARMACEUTICAL AGENTS CONTAINING FLUOROALKYLATED METAL COMPLEXES AND EPOTHILONE

Title (en)

PHARMACEUTICAL AGENTS CONTAINING FLUOROALKYLATED METAL COMPLEXES AND EPOTHILONE

Title (de)

PHARMAZEUTISCHE MITTEL ENTHALTEND FLUORALKYLHALTIGE METALLKOMPLEXE UND EPOTHILONE

Title (fr)

AGENTS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT DES COMPLEXES METALLIQUES A BASE DE FLUOROALKYLE ET DES EPOTHILONES

Publication

EP 1848429 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06706829 A

Priority

  • EP 2006001200 W
  • DE 102005008309 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2006257322A1] The invention relates to pharmaceutical agents that contain at least one fluoroalkyl-containing metal complex that has a critical micelle-formation concentration of <10<SUP>-3 </SUP>mol/l and a hydrodynamic micelle diameter (2Rh) of >1 nm, and at least one natural or synthetic epothilone or epothilone derivative, optionally with the additives that are commonly used in galenicals.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/427 (2006.01); A61K 31/28 (2006.01); A61K 31/422 (2006.01); A61K 31/4427 (2006.01); A61K 33/24 (2006.01); A61K 49/06 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 49/085 (2013.01); A61K 31/28 (2013.01); A61K 31/422 (2013.01); A61K 31/427 (2013.01); A61K 31/4427 (2013.01); A61K 33/24 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01); A61K 49/10 (2013.01); A61K 49/103 (2013.01); A61K 49/106 (2013.01); A61K 49/18 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 31/28 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 31/422 + A61K 2300/00
  3. A61K 31/427 + A61K 2300/00
  4. A61K 31/4427 + A61K 2300/00
  5. A61K 33/24 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006087145A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005008309 A1 20060824; AR 052912 A1 20070411; DO P2006000038 A 20060815; EP 1848429 A1 20071031; GT 200600073 A 20070103; JP 2008530157 A 20080807; PA 8663801 A1 20061207; PE 10642006 A1 20061108; TW 200640456 A 20061201; US 2006257322 A1 20061116; UY 29382 A1 20061002; WO 2006087145 A1 20060824

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100901

2008-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PRESS, WOLF-RUEDIGER

2008-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHOEN, KATJA

2008-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOFFMANN, JENS

2008-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLAR, ULRICH

2008-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAWACZECK, RUEDIGER

2008-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MISSELWITZ, BERND

2008-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PLATZEK, JOHANNES

2008-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHIRMER, HEIKO

2008-05-21 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAWACZECK, RUEDIGER

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PRESS, WOLF-RUEDIGER

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHOEN, KATJA

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOFFMANN, JENS

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLAR, ULRICH

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MISSELWITZ, BERND

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PLATZEK, JOHANNES

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHIRMER, HEIKO

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070713

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR