Global Patent Index - EP 1848457 A2

EP 1848457 A2 2007-10-31 - VACCINES AGAINST NEISSERIA MENINGITIDIS

Title (en)

VACCINES AGAINST NEISSERIA MENINGITIDIS

Title (de)

IMPFSTOFFE GEGEN NEISSERIA MENINGITIDIS

Title (fr)

VACCINS CONTRE NEISSERIA MENINGITIDIS

Publication

EP 1848457 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 05823115 A

Priority

  • GB 2005005113 W
  • GB 2004005441 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006067518A2] Various polypeptides, or a variant or fragment thereof or a fusion of these are described which are useful in a vaccine. The polypeptide may be a polypeptide comprising the amino acid sequence selected from any one of SEQ ID Nos (2, 4, 6, 8, 10, 12, 14, 16, 18, 20, 22, 24, 26, 28, 30, 32, 34, 36, 38, 40, 42, 44, 46, 48, 50, 52, 54, 56, 58, 60, 62, 64, 66, 68); or a fragment or variant thereof or a fusion of such fragment or variant, and is useful in a vaccine against Neisseira meningitidis.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/095 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/22 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006067518A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006067518 A2 20060629; WO 2006067518 A3 20061123; AU 2005317835 A1 20060629; CA 2592156 A1 20060629; CN 101115502 A 20080130; CN 101370514 A 20090218; EP 1848457 A2 20071031; JP 2008525008 A 20080717; KR 20070094762 A 20070921; MX 2007007886 A 20080116; NO 20073256 A 20070917; RU 2007127921 A 20090127

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1106707

2009-03-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080126

2008-04-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-03-20 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1106707

2007-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070719

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR