Global Patent Index - EP 1848516 A1

EP 1848516 A1 2007-10-31 - CROSS-COUNTRY OR TOURING SKI BINDING

Title (en)

CROSS-COUNTRY OR TOURING SKI BINDING

Title (de)

LANGLAUF -ODER TOURENSKIBINDUNG

Title (fr)

FIXATION DE SKI DE FOND OU DE SKI DE RANDONNEE

Publication

EP 1848516 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06701291 A

Priority

  • IB 2006000072 W
  • DE 102005005297 A
  • DE 102005026725 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102005026725A1] The skies has a plastic made housing (12), to which a binding ski shoe is articulately received. The receiver consists of metal having a closing element (13), which by means of an actuator (16) is tiltably stored in the housing (12) such that a lever (16) can be moved from a closing position, in which the lever is linked, into a release position. The housing (12) has a receiving area on the base (19) where a quick release actuator (16) is provided. A closing element is provided with the quick release actuator within the receiving area in the base for freely accessible assembly or disassembly. The closing element (13) can move from the closing element to the release position by a flexible pre-loaded spring.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/20 (2006.01); A63C 9/00 (2006.01); A63C 9/02 (2006.01); A63C 9/085 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/20 (2013.01); A63C 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005026725 A1 20060614; AT 448841 T 20091215; DE 502006005398 D1 20091231; EP 1848516 A1 20071031; EP 1848516 B1 20091118; RU 2007132979 A 20090410; RU 2382667 C2 20100227; WO 2006082483 A1 20060810

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180103

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-12-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-12-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110117

2012-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 448841 T

- Effective date: 20110117

2010-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100819

2010-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091118

2010-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091118

2009-12-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006005398 P 20091231

2009-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR SE

2008-05-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-03-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR SE

2008-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080124

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070702

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR SE