Global Patent Index - EP 1848600 A1

EP 1848600 A1 2007-10-31 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN AIR FLOW IN THE INTERIOR OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN AIR FLOW IN THE INTERIOR OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES LUFTSTROMS IN EINEN INNENRAUM EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UN COURANT D'AIR DANS L'HABITACLE D'UN VEHICULE

Publication

EP 1848600 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06703916 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000706 W
  • DE 102005006946 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006087081A1] The invention relates to a method for controlling an air flow in the interior of a motor vehicle, and a device for implementing said method. Said method is characterised in that, when a threshold speed is exceeded, the storage of an error message in an air conditioning control appliance is prevented. To this end, the inventive device comprises corresponding sensor systems for defining parameters used to determine the threshold speed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60H 1/00978 (2013.01); B60H 1/00828 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006087081A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006087081 A1 20060824; DE 102005006946 B3 20060907; EP 1848600 A1 20071031; JP 2008529887 A 20080807; US 2008220710 A1 20080911

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090616

2008-05-21 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-03-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-12-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLER AG

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070621

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT