Global Patent Index - EP 1848629 A1

EP 1848629 A1 2007-10-31 - LAUNCH AND RECOVERY APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (en)

LAUNCH AND RECOVERY APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR AUS- UND ANDOCKEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE LANCEMENT ET DE RECUPERATION

Publication

EP 1848629 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06709762 A

Priority

  • GB 2006000525 W
  • GB 0503083 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006087540A1] Apparatus for the launch and recover of boats (48), submersibles and the like includes a support (182) surface and a mounting means for attachment to a fixed structure. The apparatus is rendered buoyant in the water, for example by including inflatable and deflatable members (130, 132).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 23/32 (2006.01); B63C 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 23/32 (2013.01); B63C 3/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006087540A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006087540 A1 20060824; AU 2006215396 A1 20060824; CA 2598077 A1 20060824; EP 1848629 A1 20071031; GB 0503083 D0 20050323; US 2008145149 A1 20080619

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120822

2010-01-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091207

2008-09-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IHC ENGINEERING BUSINESS LIMITED

2008-05-21 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070724

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR