Global Patent Index - EP 1848638 A1

EP 1848638 A1 2007-10-31 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREPARING A GRAND BALE OF PULP SHEET AND CORRESPONDING GRAND BALE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREPARING A GRAND BALE OF PULP SHEET AND CORRESPONDING GRAND BALE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GROSSEN BALLENS AUS ZELLSTOFFBOGEN UND ENTSPRECHENDER GROSSER BALLEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PREPARATION D`UNE GROSSE BALE DE FEUILLE DE PULPE ET GROSSE BALE CORRESPONDANTE

Publication

EP 1848638 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06701236 A

Priority

  • FI 2006050038 W
  • FI 20050072 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006077285A1] The invention relates to a method and device for preparing a grand bale (10) of pulp sheet or similar. The grand bale (10) of pulp sheet contains two or more pulp-sheet bales (12) , each of which pulp-sheet bales (12) is bound by wrapping a web-like wrapping band (16) around the bale to bind the bale. The wrap ping band (16) has a start (18) lying against the pulp-sheet bale (12) and an end (20) remaining on the surface of the wrapping band (16) . 1,5 or more rounds of wrapping band (16) are wrapped around the pulp-sheet bale (12) . The pulp-sheet bales (12) are placed on top of each other, in such a way that gravity forms a bond between the rounds of wrapping band (16) when they remain between two of the pulp-sheet bales (12) on top of each other in the grand bale (10) . The invention also relates to a corresponding grand bale (10) of pulp sheet.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 27/12 (2006.01); B65B 11/02 (2006.01); B65B 27/08 (2006.01); B65D 75/02 (2006.01); B65D 85/07 (2017.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

B65B (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 27/08 (2013.01); B65B 27/125 (2013.01); B65D 85/07 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006077285 A1 20060727; BR PI0606428 A2 20090630; CA 2591024 A1 20060727; CN 100586801 C 20100203; CN 101107169 A 20080116; EP 1848638 A1 20071031; EP 1848638 A4 20120321; FI 20050072 A0 20050124; RU 2007132077 A 20090227; RU 2397929 C2 20100827; US 2008156668 A1 20080703

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130215

2012-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20121004

2012-03-21 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20120220

2012-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 27/12 20060101AFI20120201BHEP

2012-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 11/02 20060101ALI20120201BHEP

2012-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 75/02 20060101ALI20120201BHEP

2012-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 27/08 20060101ALI20120201BHEP

2012-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 85/16 20060101ALI20120201BHEP

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070615

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR