Global Patent Index - EP 1848644 A1

EP 1848644 A1 2007-10-31 - A REUSABLE CONTAINER WITH RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION SEAL

Title (en)

A REUSABLE CONTAINER WITH RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION SEAL

Title (de)

WIEDERVERWENDBARER BEHÄLTER MIT HOCHFREQUENZIDENTIFIKATIONSSIEGEL

Title (fr)

CONTENEUR REUTILISABLE AVEC SCEAU D'IDENTIFICATION PAR RADIOFREQUENCES

Publication

EP 1848644 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06704890 A

Priority

  • AU 2006000213 W
  • US 65349605 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006086848A1] A container (100) enclosing an interior (111) and having at least one door (101, 102) that can be displaced from a closed position preventing access to said interior, and an open position providing access to said interior; the container including: a first recess, said recess being in said door(101, 102); an insert (206, 208) projecting into said recess so as to extend outwardly therefrom to provide an insert portion outside the slot; a second recess, said second recess being in a part of said container other than said door (101, 102); a second insert (206, 208), said second insert projecting inwardly of said second recess so as to extend outwardly therefrom to provide an insert portion outside said second recess; and wherein when said door is in said closed position the portions are adjacently located so that when secured together movement of the door toward the open position is inhibited.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/00 (2006.01); B65D 5/42 (2006.01); B65D 50/00 (2006.01); B65D 55/00 (2006.01); B65D 55/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/4233 (2013.01); B65D 55/06 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0007 (2013.01); B65D 2203/10 (2013.01); B65D 2211/00 (2013.01); Y02W 30/807 (2015.05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006086848 A1 20060824; AU 2006214802 A1 20060824; AU 2006214802 B2 20100916; BR PI0607810 A2 20091006; CA 2597337 A1 20060824; CN 101119901 A 20080206; CN 101119901 B 20101110; EP 1848644 A1 20071031; EP 1848644 A4 20101013; MX 2007010046 A 20071212; RU 2345938 C1 20090210; US 2008245791 A1 20081009

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111201

2011-06-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 43/00 20060101AFI20110520BHEP

2011-06-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 50/00 20060101ALI20110520BHEP

2011-06-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 55/00 20060101ALI20110520BHEP

2011-06-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 5/42 20060101ALI20110520BHEP

2011-06-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 55/06 20060101ALI20110520BHEP

2010-10-13 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100913

2010-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 43/00 20060101AFI20060906BHEP

2010-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 50/00 20060101ALI20100907BHEP

2010-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 55/00 20060101ALI20100907BHEP

2010-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 5/42 20060101ALI20100907BHEP

2010-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 55/06 20060101ALI20100907BHEP

2008-05-21 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070813

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR