Global Patent Index - EP 1848774 A1

EP 1848774 A1 2007-10-31 - TRANSPARENT MOULDING COMPOUND

Title (en)

TRANSPARENT MOULDING COMPOUND

Title (de)

TRANSPARENTE FORMMASSE

Title (fr)

MATIERE A MOULER TRANSPARENTE

Publication

EP 1848774 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06700749 A

Priority

  • EP 2006050036 W
  • DE 102005007664 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006087248A1] The invention relates to a moulding compound containing the following components: (a) a partially crystalline copolyamide, and (b) an effective amount of a crystallisation auxiliary selected from nanoscale fillers and metal salts, metal oxides and metal hydroxides that can react with the carboxyl terminal groups of the copolyamide. The copolyamide can be produced from the following combination of monomers: a) 50 to 99 mol. % of a lactam or a corresponding ?-aminocarboxylic acid with 8, 9, 10, 11 or 12 carbon atoms or an essentially equimolar mixture of a diamine and a dicarboxylic acid, the diamine being selected from the group comprising 1.6-hexamethylene diamine, 1.8-octamethylene diamine, 1.10-decamethylene diamine and 1.12-dodecamethylene diamine and the dicarboxylic acid being selected from the group comprising sebacic acid and 1.12-dodecanedioic acid, and (ß) 1 to 50 mol. % of an essentially equimolar mixture of a diamine and a dicarboxylic acid, where either the diamine or the dicarboxylic acid or both differ from, respectively, the diamine used in a) and the dicarboxylic acid used in a), or of another lactam or the corresponding ?-aminocarboxylic acid. The moulding compound is transparent and readily workable, and can be decorated using screen printing techniques.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08L 77/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08J 5/18 (2013.01); C08G 69/08 (2013.01); C08G 69/265 (2013.01); C08G 69/36 (2013.01); C08L 77/04 (2013.01); C08L 77/06 (2013.01); C08J 2377/00 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24802 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08L 77/04 + C08L 2666/54
  2. C08L 77/06 + C08L 2666/54

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006087248A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006087248 A1 20060824; CN 1821305 A 20060823; DE 102005007664 A1 20060831; EP 1848774 A1 20071031; JP 2008530325 A 20080807; TW 200806741 A 20080201; US 2008166529 A1 20080710

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100713

2008-08-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH

2008-05-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-02-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080122

2007-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HAEGER, HARALD

2007-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAUMANN, FRANZ-ERICH

2007-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BEYER, MICHAEL

2007-11-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070727

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR