Global Patent Index - EP 1848788 A2

EP 1848788 A2 2007-10-31 - UPGRADING OF PETROLEUM BY COMBINED ULTRASOUND AND MICROWAVE TREATMENTS

Title (en)

UPGRADING OF PETROLEUM BY COMBINED ULTRASOUND AND MICROWAVE TREATMENTS

Title (de)

VEREDELUNG VON ERDÖL DURCH KOMBINIERTE BEHANDLUNG MIT ULTRASCHALL UND MIKROWELLEN

Title (fr)

AMELIORATION DU PETROLE PAR DES TRAITEMENTS COMBINES AUX ULTRASONS ET AUX MICRO-ONDES

Publication

EP 1848788 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06717486 A

Priority

  • US 2006000293 W
  • US 5911505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2006180500A1] The treatment of petroleum and petroleum fractions by ultrasound to reduce or eliminate the sulfur levels and to upgrade the material by lowering the boiling points of its various components is improved by the exposure of the treated emulsion to microwave energy to separate the phases.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 32/02 (2006.01); C10L 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 32/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

US 2006180500 A1 20060817; AR 053670 A1 20070516; CA 2601578 A1 20060824; CN 101155900 A 20080402; EP 1848788 A2 20071031; EP 1848788 A4 20080827; KR 20070107120 A 20071106; NO 20074551 A 20071113; RU 2007134398 A 20090327; RU 2361901 C2 20090720; WO 2006088567 A2 20060824; WO 2006088567 A3 20071025

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090828

2008-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081030

2008-08-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-08-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10G 32/02 20060101AFI20080716BHEP

2008-08-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 1/04 20060101ALI20080716BHEP

2008-05-21 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-12-12 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20071025

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070905

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU