Global Patent Index - EP 1848789 A1

EP 1848789 A1 2007-10-31 - PROCESSING OR WORKING MACHINE COMPRISING AN IONIC LIQUID AS THE SERVICE FLUID

Title (en)

PROCESSING OR WORKING MACHINE COMPRISING AN IONIC LIQUID AS THE SERVICE FLUID

Title (de)

PROZESS- BZW. ARBEITSMASCHINE MIT IONISCHER FLÜSSIGKEIT ALS BETRIEBSFLÜSSIGKEIT

Title (fr)

MACHINE DE PROCEDE OU DE TRAVAIL DANS LAQUELLE LE LIQUIDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT EST UN LIQUIDE IONIQUE

Publication

EP 1848789 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06708277 A

Priority

  • EP 2006050941 W
  • DE 102005007100 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2008038123A1] The invention relates to a processing or working machine comprising a liquid as the operating liquid wherein the invention is characterized in that an ionic liquid constitutes said operating liquid. The invention also relates to the use of operating fluids in processing or working machines, wherein an ionic liquid constitutes the operating liquid and is used, in particular, as a lubricating fluid, barrier fluid, sealing fluid, or a pressure transmission fluid.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 105/72 (2006.01); C07C 211/63 (2006.01); C10M 105/70 (2006.01); C10M 105/74 (2006.01); C10M 105/78 (2006.01); C10N 40/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 105/70 (2013.01); C10M 105/72 (2013.01); C10M 105/74 (2013.01); C10M 105/78 (2013.01); C10M 2215/023 (2013.01); C10M 2215/2203 (2013.01); C10M 2215/2245 (2013.01); C10M 2223/0603 (2013.01); C10N 2220/04 (2013.01); C10N 2240/08 (2013.01); C10N 2240/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006087333A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005007100 A1 20060817; EP 1848789 A1 20071031; JP 2008530441 A 20080807; US 2008038123 A1 20080214; WO 2006087333 A1 20060824

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-06 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20120929

2012-09-29 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2012-02-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120123

2010-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HILGERS, CLAUS

2010-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UERDINGEN, MARC

2010-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAGNER, MARKUS

2010-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WASSERSCHEID, PETER

2010-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHLUECKER, EBERHARD

2010-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRONEK, AXEL

2008-05-21 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MERCK PATENT GMBH

2007-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HILGERS, CLAUS

2007-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UERDINGEN, MARC

2007-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAGNER, MARKUS

2007-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WASSERSCHEID, PETER

2007-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHLUECKER, EBERHARD

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070806

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR