Global Patent Index - EP 1848797 A2

EP 1848797 A2 2007-10-31 - NOVEL GENE VCS 03

Title (en)

NOVEL GENE VCS 03

Title (de)

NEUES GEN VCS 03

Title (fr)

NOUVEAU GENE VCS 03

Publication

EP 1848797 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06706836 A

Priority

  • EP 2006001208 W
  • EP 05405094 A
  • EP 05405066 A
  • EP 06706836 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006084713A2] The present invention relates to newly identified genes that encode proteins that are involved in the synthesis of L-ascorbic acid (hereinafter also referred to as Vitamin C). The invention also features polynucleotides comprising the full-length polynucleotide sequences of the novel genes and fragments thereof, the novel polypeptides encoded by the polynucleotides and fragments thereof, as well as their functional equivalents. The present invention also relates to the use of said polynucleotides and polypeptides as biotechnological tools in the production of Vitamin C from microorganisms, whereby a modification of said polynucleotides and/or encoded polypeptides has a direct or indirect impact on yield, production, and/or efficiency of production of the fermentation product in said microorganism. Also included are methods/processes of using the polynucleotides and modified polynucleotide sequences to transform host microorganisms. The invention also relates to genetically engineered microorganisms and their use for the direct production of Vitamin C.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12P 17/04 (2013.01); C12N 9/0034 (2013.01); C12Y 105/03001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006084713 A2 20060817; WO 2006084713 A3 20070125; EP 1848797 A2 20071031

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091222

2008-05-21 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071221

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHEVREUX, BASTIEN

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GELDER VAN, MARINA

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAUK, CORINA

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOEKMAN, BERTUS, PIETER

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MEURY, ANJA

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOUNCEY, NIGEL, JOHN

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHIPPER, DICK

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHINJOH, MASAKO

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VOLLEBREGT, ADRIANUS, WILHELMUS, HERMANUS

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070824

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR