Global Patent Index - EP 1848825 A2

EP 1848825 A2 2007-10-31 - METHODS OF PREDICTING CHEMOTHERAPY RESPONSIVENESS IN BREAST CANCER PATIENTS

Title (en)

METHODS OF PREDICTING CHEMOTHERAPY RESPONSIVENESS IN BREAST CANCER PATIENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE DER ANSPRECHBARKEIT AUF CHEMOTHERAPIE BEI BRUSTKREBSPATIENTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE PREVISION DE LA REACTIVITE A LA CHIMIOTHERAPIE CHEZ DES PATIENTES SOUFFRANT DU CANCER DU SEIN

Publication

EP 1848825 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06720440 A

Priority

  • US 2006004280 W
  • US 65036505 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006084272A2] The invention provides a method of predicting the responsiveness of a breast cancer patient to chemotherapy based on the patient's cellular constituent profile comprising measurements of a plurality of cellular constituents in a sample derived from the patient, the patient's estrogen receptor level, and the patient's estrogen receptor level relative to the patient's age. The invention also provides a method for selecting patients for enrollment in a clinical trial of a drug for treating breast cancer based on these factors.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6886 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006084272A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006084272 A2 20060810; WO 2006084272 A3 20080828; WO 2006084272 A9 20071004; CA 2596640 A1 20060810; EP 1848825 A2 20071031; JP 2008536094 A 20080904

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-10-08 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20080828

2008-05-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-04-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAI, HONGYUE

2008-04-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRIEND, STEPHEN, H

2008-04-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEUTSCH, PAUL

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070813

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU