Global Patent Index - EP 1848845 A1

EP 1848845 A1 2007-10-31 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING ANTIMICROBIAL ELASTIC FIBER

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PREPARING ANTIMICROBIAL ELASTIC FIBER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ANTIMIKROBIELLEN ELASTOFASER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UNE FIBRE ELASTIQUE ANTIMICROBIENNE

Publication

EP 1848845 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 05733511 A

Priority

  • KR 2005000988 W
  • KR 20040113981 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006070971A1] Disclosed herein is a process for preparing an antimicrobial elastic fiber. The process comprises: mixing a glass compound, as an antimicrobial agent, containing ZnO, SiO<SUB>2</SUB>, and an alkali metal oxide, and having an average particle size of 0.1 µm to 5 µm, with a dispersant; sand grinding or milling the mixture; and adding the ground or milled mixture to a solution of a segmented polyurethane polymer to prepare an elastic yarn. The process can provide advantageous effects that spinnability is improved and the color of yarn remains unchanged.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 1/10 (2006.01); D01F 6/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 1/103 (2013.01); D01F 6/70 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2927 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006070971 A1 20060706; BR PI0507099 A 20070619; BR PI0507099 B1 20161011; CN 100570024 C 20091216; CN 101061265 A 20071024; EP 1848845 A1 20071031; EP 1848845 A4 20090812; JP 2008525653 A 20080717; KR 100615778 B1 20060825; KR 20060075227 A 20060704; MX 2007005028 A 20070619; TW 200624628 A 20060716; US 2007292684 A1 20071220

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110430

2010-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101019

2009-08-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090715

2009-08-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D01F 1/10 20060101AFI20060713BHEP

2009-08-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D01F 6/70 20060101ALI20090709BHEP

2008-05-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE IE IT

2008-04-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-04-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE IE IT

2007-11-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE IE IT

2007-11-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG DE IE IT

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070426