Global Patent Index - EP 1848934 A1

EP 1848934 A1 2007-10-31 - REFRIGERATION CIRCUIT WITH IMPROVED LIQUID/VAPOUR RECEIVER

Title (en)

REFRIGERATION CIRCUIT WITH IMPROVED LIQUID/VAPOUR RECEIVER

Title (de)

KÄLTEKREISLAUF MIT VERBESSERTEM FLÜSSIGKEITS-/DAMPFEMPFÄNGER

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT DE RÉFRIGÉRATION AVEC RÉCEPTEUR AMÉLIORÉ DE LIQUIDE/VAPEUR

Publication

EP 1848934 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 05723391 A

Priority

US 2005005411 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006091190A1] Refrigeration circuit comprising a compressor, a heat-rejecting heat exchanger an expansion valve, a receiver (3), and a further expansion valve/evaporator to provide cooling. A second heat exchanger (24) is arranged in an upper gas portion of the receiver and/or a third heat exchanger (34) is arranged in a lower liquid portion of the receiver. A better liquid/vapour separation of the refrigerant and/or sub-cooling of the liquid refrigerant are achieved.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 40/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 40/02 (2013.01); F25B 9/008 (2013.01); F25B 1/10 (2013.01); F25B 2309/061 (2013.01); F25B 2341/0662 (2013.01); F25B 2400/053 (2013.01); F25B 2400/075 (2013.01); F25B 2400/13 (2013.01); F25B 2400/23 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006091190A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006091190 A1 20060831; AU 2005327954 A1 20060831; CN 100590372 C 20100217; CN 101124441 A 20080213; EP 1848934 A1 20071031; EP 1848934 B1 20160914; JP 2008530511 A 20080807; MX 2007010002 A 20080319; US 2009019878 A1 20090122

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160914

2017-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20170615

2017-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160914

2017-07-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602005050243

- Representative's name: SCHMITT-NILSON SCHRAUD WAIBEL WOHLFROM PATENTA, DE

2017-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160914

2017-06-15 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602005050243

2017-05-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160914

2017-05-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170114

2017-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160914

2017-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170116

2017-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161214

2017-05-31 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160914

2017-05-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160914

2017-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160914

2017-04-28 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160914

2017-04-28 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160914

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160914

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160914

2017-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161215

2017-02-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 829451 T

- Effective date: 20160914

2017-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOHEST AG, CH

2017-01-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160914

2017-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160914

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-01-10 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2016-12-21 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2016-10-27 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602005050243

2016-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 829451 T

- Effective date: 20161015

2016-10-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2016-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2016-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2016-09-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2016-06-01 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160506

2015-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20151111

2015-09-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1107840

2008-05-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-04-18 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1107840

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070803

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR