Global Patent Index - EP 1848937 A1

EP 1848937 A1 2007-10-31 - A COOLING DEVICE AND A CONTROL METHOD THEREOF

Title (en)

A COOLING DEVICE AND A CONTROL METHOD THEREOF

Title (de)

KÜHLVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REFROIDISSEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE

Publication

EP 1848937 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06710892 A

Priority

  • IB 2006050465 W
  • TR 200500510 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006087669A1] A cooling device (1) wherein the air circulation is realized in at least two different directions and the control method thereof.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/062 (2013.01); F25D 2317/0684 (2013.01); F25D 2700/123 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006087669A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006087669 A1 20060824; CN 100538226 C 20090909; CN 101128711 A 20080220; EP 1848937 A1 20071031; KR 100924733 B1 20091104; KR 20070103450 A 20071023; RU 2007134350 A 20090327; RU 2362949 C2 20090727

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20171005

2017-06-21 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170524

2013-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130731

2008-05-21 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070816

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR