Global Patent Index - EP 1848950 A1

EP 1848950 A1 2007-10-31 - ADJUSTABLE GUN CARRIAGE AND WEAPON ARRANGEMENT WITH AN ADJUSTABLE GUN CARRIAGE

Title (en)

ADJUSTABLE GUN CARRIAGE AND WEAPON ARRANGEMENT WITH AN ADJUSTABLE GUN CARRIAGE

Title (de)

FREIRICHTLAFETTE SOWIE WAFFENANORDNUNG MIT EINER FREIRICHTLAFETTE

Title (fr)

AFFUT A POINTAGE LIBRE ET ENSEMBLE ARME DOTE D'UN AFFUT A POINTAGE LIBRE

Publication

EP 1848950 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 05778145 A

Priority

  • EP 2005009669 W
  • DE 102004043711 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2006048642A1] Adjustable gun carriages are disclosed. An example gun carriage includes: a coarse height adjustment brake; a coarse side-to-side adjustment brake; a fine height orientation adjustment mechanism; a fine side-to-side orientation adjustment mechanism; a first control to actuate the coarse height adjustment brake; a second control to actuate the fine height orientation adjustment mechanism; a third control to actuate the coarse side-to-side adjustment brake; and a fourth control to actuate the fine side-to-side orientation adjustment mechanism.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 27/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 27/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006027249A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2006048642 A1 20060309; US 7210391 B2 20070501; CA 2578832 A1 20060316; CA 2578832 C 20091124; DE 102004043711 A1 20060330; DE 102004043711 B4 20070531; EP 1848950 A1 20071031; KR 100925087 B1 20091105; KR 20070057827 A 20070607; WO 2006027249 A1 20060316; ZA 200701986 B 20080528

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100309

2009-11-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ADJUSTABLE GUN CARRIAGE AND WEAPON ARRANGEMENT WITH AN ADJUSTABLE GUN CARRIAGE

2009-11-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ADJUSTABLE GUN CARRIAGE AND WEAPON ARRANGEMENT WITH ANADJUSTABLE GUN CARRIAGE

2007-12-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070307

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR