Global Patent Index - EP 1848996 A1

EP 1848996 A1 2007-10-31 - A METHOD FOR CO-TRANSPORTING A REACTANT WITH AN AMPHIPHILIC MACROMOLECULAR SUBSTANS IN A MICROFLUID TRANSPORT CONDUIT

Title (en)

A METHOD FOR CO-TRANSPORTING A REACTANT WITH AN AMPHIPHILIC MACROMOLECULAR SUBSTANS IN A MICROFLUID TRANSPORT CONDUIT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM GEMEINSAMEN TRANSPORT EINES REAKTANDEN MIT EINEM AMPHIPHILEN MAKROMOLEKULAREN STOFF IN EINEM MIKROFLUIDTRANSPORTKANAL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE CO-TRANSPORTER UN REACTIF AVEC UNE SUBSTANCE MACROMOLECULAIRE AMPHIPHILE DANS UN CONDUIT DE TRANSPORT MICROFLUIDIQUE

Publication

EP 1848996 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06700622 A

Priority

  • SE 2006000070 W
  • SE 0500131 A
  • US 3871205 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006075964A1] A method for transporting in a microfluidic transport conduit an aliquot of a liquid in which there is a reactant of an experimental protocol. The characteristic feature comprises co-transporting the reactant together with an amphiphilic macromolecular substance, and/or that inner surfaces of said microconduit is coated with such a macromolecular substance

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); B01J 19/00 (2006.01); B01L 3/00 (2006.01); G01N 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/0241 (2013.01); B01L 3/5027 (2013.01); B01L 2300/163 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006075964 A1 20060720; EP 1848996 A1 20071031; EP 1848996 A4 20091202; JP 2008527371 A 20080724

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121103

2011-04-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110303

2009-12-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20091030

2008-04-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070816

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR