Global Patent Index - EP 1849054 A1

EP 1849054 A1 2007-10-31 - DATA STORAGE DEVICE

Title (en)

DATA STORAGE DEVICE

Title (de)

DATENSPEICHEREINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE DE DONNEES

Publication

EP 1849054 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 05807956 A

Priority

  • EP 2005055972 W
  • FR 0500109 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006072500A1] The invention relates to a data storage device (10) comprising a memory space (20) divided into memory blocks and an internal file system management means (30) which organises said memory blocks for storing data in a form of a file structure according to a file-type control format, wherein said device is characterised in that it comprises a protocol conversion interface (80) between said file system management means (30) and a host device (40) which is provided with means (70) for accessing to data in the storage device according to a block-type control format.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/06 (2006.01); G06F 21/62 (2013.01); G06F 21/77 (2013.01); G06F 21/78 (2013.01); G07F 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/1008 (2013.01); G06F 3/0607 (2013.01); G06F 3/0622 (2013.01); G06F 3/0661 (2013.01); G06F 3/0664 (2013.01); G06F 3/0679 (2013.01); G06F 21/6218 (2013.01); G06F 21/77 (2013.01); G06F 21/78 (2013.01); G06Q 20/341 (2013.01); G06Q 20/351 (2013.01); G06Q 20/3576 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006072500A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2880444 A1 20060707; FR 2880444 B1 20070309; EP 1849054 A1 20071031; JP 2008527511 A 20080724; JP 4807683 B2 20111102; US 2008005531 A1 20080103; WO 2006072500 A1 20060713

INPADOC legal status


2014-06-25 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20131107

2013-11-07 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2009-09-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEMALTO SA

2008-04-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080111

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070806

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR