Global Patent Index - EP 1849128 A1

EP 1849128 A1 2007-10-31 - LOYALTY PROGRAM FOR CONSUMERS AND METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REWARDING A CONSUMER

Title (en)

LOYALTY PROGRAM FOR CONSUMERS AND METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REWARDING A CONSUMER

Title (de)

LOYALITÄTSPROGRAMM FÜR VERBRAUCHER UND VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM BELOHNEN EINES VERBRAUCHERS

Title (fr)

PROGRAMME DE FIDELITE POUR CONSOMMATEUR, PROCEDE ET SYSTEME SERVANT A RECOMPENSER LE CONSOMMATEUR

Publication

EP 1849128 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06706376 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000583 W
  • DE 102005001218 A
  • US 3231305 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006072605A1] The invention relates generally to methods, systems and programs for engendering loyalty in various consumers and customers and, in particular, to a loyalty program for television stations, radio stations and other providers of media, as well as a method and system for rewarding a consumer / user of a medium (e.g. a television viewer who watches various channels of television, a listener of a radio station or a reader of a publication).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006072605A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006072605 A1 20060713; CA 2593300 A1 20060713; EP 1849128 A1 20071031

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100504

2010-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: 21ST CENTURY ENTERTAINMENT GROUP AG

2008-04-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TREESE, NORBERT

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070716

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR