Global Patent Index - EP 1849295 A1

EP 1849295 A1 2007-10-31 - PROFILING DIGITAL-IMAGE INPUT DEVICES

Title (en)

PROFILING DIGITAL-IMAGE INPUT DEVICES

Title (de)

PROFILIERUNG VON DIGITALBILD-EINGABEEINRICHTUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROFILAGE DE DISPOSITIFS D'ENTREE D'IMAGE NUMERIQUE

Publication

EP 1849295 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06720018 A

Priority

  • US 2006003457 W
  • US 30307105 A
  • US 65299805 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006088641A1] In a system and a method for profiling a digital-image input device, profiling of the digital-image input device is performed based at least on an image of a color chart and an estimated illumination of the color chart generated by comparing illumination of device-dependent coordinate values for the image of the color chart with illumination of device-independent coordinate values of the color chart. Because the estimated illumination of the color chart is performed on data pertaining to the color chart, the present invention may generate a profile without reference to data pertaining to scenery in the image outside of the color chart. Consequently, the present invention may generate a profile irrespective of the relative exposure of the color chart with respect to other scenery in the image.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 1/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 1/6033 (2013.01); H04N 1/6086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006088641A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006088641 A1 20060824; EP 1849295 A1 20071031; JP 2008533773 A 20080821; JP 4881325 B2 20120222

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MONUMENT PEAK VENTURES, LLC

2015-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150316

2013-05-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTELLECTUAL VENTURES FUND 83 LLC

2008-05-21 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-03-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070725

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB