Global Patent Index - EP 1849527 A2

EP 1849527 A2 2007-10-31 - Atomiser and appropriate operating method

Title (en)

Atomiser and appropriate operating method

Title (de)

Zerstäuber und zugehöriges Betriebsverfahren

Title (fr)

Atomiseur et procédé de fonctionnement correspondant

Publication

EP 1849527 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07007204 A

Priority

DE 102006019890 A

Abstract (en)

The atomizer has application element for the application of coating medium jet (5) on a component which is coated, and atomizer housing. A cladding current nozzle (10) is arranged in the atomizer housing for discharge of an air-conditioned cladding current, which partly surrounds the coating medium jet. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) electrostatic painting system (2) an operating method for an atomizer.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Zerstäuber (1), insbesondere einen Rotationszerstäuber, mit einem Applikationselement (2) zur Applikation eines Beschichtungsmittelstrahls (5) auf ein zu beschichtendes Bauteil und mindestens einer Hüllstromdüse (10) zur Abgabe eines klimatisierten Hüllstroms (11), der den Beschichtungsmittelstrahl (5) mindestens teilweise umgibt. Weiterhin umfasst die Erfindung ein entsprechendes Betriebsverfahren.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/0426 (2013.01); B05B 5/001 (2013.01); B05B 12/18 (2018.02); B05B 5/0407 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1849527 A2 20071031; EP 1849527 A3 20100505; DE 102006019890 A1 20071115; DE 102006019890 B4 20081016; JP 2007296520 A 20071115; JP 5548330 B2 20140716; US 2007262170 A1 20071115; US 7971805 B2 20110705

INPADOC legal status


2016-09-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DUERR SYSTEMS AG

2011-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR TR

2010-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101117

2010-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20101022

2010-05-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-05-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2010-01-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DUERR SYSTEMS GMBH

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU