Global Patent Index - EP 1849561 A2

EP 1849561 A2 2007-10-31 - Hand tool device with adjustable handles

Title (en)

Hand tool device with adjustable handles

Title (de)

Handwerkzeuggerät mit verstellbaren Handgriffen

Title (fr)

Outil manuel doté d'une poignée réglable

Publication

EP 1849561 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07106500 A

Priority

DE 102006000207 A

Abstract (en)

The apparatus (2) has a drive arrangement (10) for striking admission of a tool retainer (20) along an operating direction (R), and an outer housing (8) in which the drive arrangement is partially accommodated. Two adjustable handles (30) are provided at sides (26, 28) of the outer housing and are fixed in different positions for adjusting the gripping height (H) opposite to the tool retainer. The handles are movably supported between a number of positions opposite to the tool retainer, and are fixed in the selected position. A guide for the handles is provided at the drive arrangement.

Abstract (de)

Ein Handwerkzeuggerät (2), insbesondere in Form eines Bohr- oder Meisselhammers, weist eine Antriebsanordnung (10) zur schlagenden Beaufschlagung einer Werkzeugaufnahme (20) entlang einer Arbeitsrichtung (R), ein Aussengehäuse (8), in dem die Antriebsanordnung (10) zumindest teilweise aufgenommen ist und zwei Handgriffe (30) auf, die an voneinander abgewandten Seiten (26, 28) des Aussengehäuses (8) vorgesehen sind und die zur Verstellung einer Griffhöhe (H) gegenüber der Werkzeugaufnahme (20) in verschiedenen Positionen festlegbar sind. Es ist vorgesehen, dass die Handgriffe (30) gegenüber der Werkzeugaufnahme (20) zwischen mehreren Positionen verschiebbar gelagert und in diesen Position festlegbar sind.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/04 (2006.01); B25F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/043 (2013.01); B25F 5/02 (2013.01); B25D 2250/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1849561 A2 20071031; EP 1849561 A3 20100728; EP 1849561 B1 20111221; DE 102006000207 A1 20071031; US 2008099219 A1 20080501

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170411

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170411

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-03-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-01-17 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007008891

- Effective date: 20120924

2012-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120924

2012-03-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2012-02-23 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007008891

- Effective date: 20120223

2011-12-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2011-12-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2011-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110321

2011-04-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2011-03-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20110128

2010-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2010-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B25D 17/04 20060101AFI20070910BHEP

2010-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B25F 5/02 20060101ALI20100624BHEP

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU