Global Patent Index - EP 1849568 A1

EP 1849568 A1 2007-10-31 - Apparatus for removing the covering layers from an end of a conveyor belt

Title (en)

Apparatus for removing the covering layers from an end of a conveyor belt

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Abtrennen von Deckschichten von einem Ende eines Fördergurts

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour enlever les couches de couverture de l'extremité d'une bande de convoyeur

Publication

EP 1849568 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06009001 A

Priority

EP 06009001 A

Abstract (en)

A tool for trimming the end of a conveyor belt, i.e. prior to fitting metal connecting grips, has an improved design with two cutting blades to trim both sides of the belt without having to reclamp the belt between trims. The two blades are rigid and can operate with an offset timing for improved cutting control. The trimming process is applied to both ends of the belt prior to fitting the connecting grips.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Einrichtung (1) zum Abtrennen von Deckschichten von einem Ende (4) eines Fördergurts (5), wobei die Einrichtung und der Fördergurt relativ zueinander bewegbar sind und das Abtrennen der jeweiligen Deckschicht mittels eines Messers der Einrichtung erfolgt. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, eine Einrichtung der genannten Art so weiter zu bilden, dass mit dieser schnell und präzise die einander abgewandten Deckschichten des Fördergurts abgetrennt werden können. Gelöst wird die Aufgabe dadurch, dass die Einrichtung zwei Messer (27, 28) aufweist, wobei das eine Messer (27) dem Abtrennen der Deckschicht auf der einen Seite des Fördergurts und das andere Messer (28) dem Abtrennen der Deckschicht auf der anderen Seite des Fördergurts dient.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 3/28 (2013.01); B26D 3/008 (2013.01); Y10S 83/935 (2013.01); Y10T 83/0259 (2015.04); Y10T 83/0304 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CZ DE GB PL

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1849568 A1 20071031; EP 1849568 B1 20081022; AU 2007201645 A1 20071115; AU 2007201645 B2 20120705; DE 502006001891 D1 20081204; US 2007283796 A1 20071213; US 7735404 B2 20100615; ZA 200703324 B 20080827

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170616

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140429

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140429

2014-03-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MATO GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MATO MASCHINEN- UND METALLWARENFABRIK CURT MATTHAEI GMBH & CO KG, 63071 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 502006001891

- Effective date: 20140217

2014-03-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502006001891

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE QUERMANN, STURM, WEILNAU, DE

- Effective date: 20140217

2014-03-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502006001891

- Representative's name: QUERMANN STURM WEILNAU PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERS, DE

- Effective date: 20140217

2014-02-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502006001891

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE QUERMANN, STURM, WEILNAU, DE

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-09-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090723

2009-08-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081022

2009-05-29 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081022

2008-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006001891 P 20081204

2008-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CZ DE GB PL

2008-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CZ DE GB PL

2008-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080221

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU