Global Patent Index - EP 1849572 A1

EP 1849572 A1 2007-10-31 - CORK-DECONTAMINATION METHOD AND INSTALLATION COMPRISING A VIBRATING DEVICE

Title (en)

CORK-DECONTAMINATION METHOD AND INSTALLATION COMPRISING A VIBRATING DEVICE

Title (de)

KORKDEKONTAMINIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND ANLAGE MIT EINER VIBRATIONSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DECONTAMINATION DU LIEGE ET INSTALLATION EQUIPEE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE VIBRATION

Publication

EP 1849572 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06725771 A

Priority

  • ES 2006000073 W
  • ES 200500352 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a cork-decontamination method and installation comprising a vibrating device. The inventive method consists in subjecting cork pieces to be decontaminated to a controlled vibration and performing the following phases in a combined or alternating manner, namely: a) bringing the cork into contact with an aqueous liquid inside a first tank and generating a vacuum therein under a temperature control; b) letting the soaked cork to stand or rest; and c) eliminating the absorbed liquid which contains pollutant substances.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27K 7/00 (2006.01); B08B 3/02 (2006.01); B08B 3/04 (2006.01); B08B 3/10 (2006.01); B08B 3/12 (2006.01); B08B 7/02 (2006.01); B67B 1/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27K 7/00 (2013.01); B08B 3/02 (2013.01); B08B 3/045 (2013.01); B08B 3/10 (2013.01); B08B 3/12 (2013.01); B08B 7/02 (2013.01); B27K 3/08 (2013.01); B27K 5/001 (2013.01); B27K 5/006 (2013.01); B27K 5/04 (2013.01); B67B 1/03 (2013.01); B27K 2240/15 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006087406A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1849572 A1 20071031; ES 2259547 A1 20061001; ES 2259547 B1 20070601; WO 2006087406 A1 20060824

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130701

2009-04-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B27K 7/00 20060101AFI20060829BHEP

2009-04-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B08B 3/02 20060101ALI20090223BHEP

2009-04-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B08B 3/04 20060101ALI20090223BHEP

2009-04-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B08B 3/10 20060101ALI20090223BHEP

2009-04-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B08B 3/12 20060101ALI20090223BHEP

2009-04-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B08B 7/02 20060101ALI20090223BHEP

2009-04-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B67B 1/03 20060101ALI20090223BHEP

2008-05-21 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070813

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR