Global Patent Index - EP 1849623 A1

EP 1849623 A1 2007-10-31 - Hand-held vessel

Title (en)

Hand-held vessel

Title (de)

In der Hand gehaltener Behälter

Title (fr)

Récipient a main

Publication

EP 1849623 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06008903 A

Priority

EP 06008903 A

Abstract (en)

A hand-held vessel that is comprised of a bottom (2) with four side walls attached to the bottom, with the whole forming a cavity. The back wall (3) has a lip (7) extending outwards. The front wall (6) of the vessel is sloped outwards from the cavity and has a flat surface as opposed to the back wall and the two side walls of the vessel that are curved. The lip extends the long the top of the back wall and has an elliptical hole (8) that is positioned in the middle with the axis of that elliptical hole following the axis of the lip. The elliptical hole accepts the thumb or either the left or the right hand and the curved outer surface of the vessel provides a natural position for the fingers to curve around the vessel.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44D 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44D 3/123 (2013.01); B44D 3/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1849623 A1 20071031; WO 2007129179 A2 20071115; WO 2007129179 A3 20110519; WO 2007129179 A9 20110714

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090716

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080602

2008-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080424

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU