Global Patent Index - EP 1849716 A2

EP 1849716 A2 2007-10-31 - Flowerpot and pot cover, blank therefor and corresponding packaging

Title (en)

Flowerpot and pot cover, blank therefor and corresponding packaging

Title (de)

Blumentopf- und Straußmanschetten, Zuschnitt dafür und zugehöriges Verkaufsgebinde

Title (fr)

Cache-pot et de pot de fleur, flan et emballage correspondant

Publication

EP 1849716 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07103986 A

Priority

DE 202006006744 U

Abstract (en)

The unit (11) is assembled of two circular sheets (21,22) of different materials to be combined in order to form a decorative wrapper. The inner sheet (21) is transparent and made of plastic foil. The outer layer (22) can be made of paper, card or cardboard and decorated with a printed pattern. The upper edge comprises a row of curved segments forming a pleated border after folding. Both sheets (21, 22) are connected at one spot (12) but can easily be separated for recycling.

Abstract (de)

Eine Blumentopf- oder Straußmanschette (11) besitzt eine erste Lage (21) aus einem flexiblen wasserabweisenden Material, eine zweite Lage (22) aus einem flexiblen farbigen oder bedruckten Material. Beide Lagen (21, 22) sind miteinander nicht fest verbunden und nach Gebrauch getrennt entsorgbar. Ein Zuschnitt (10) für eine Blumentopf- oder Straußmanschette (11) weist eine erste Lage (21) aus einem flexiblen wasserabweisenden Material und eine zweite Lage (22) aus einem flexiblen farbigen oder bedruckten Material auf. Beide Lagen (21, 22) sind miteinander nicht fest verbunden. Beide Lagen (21, 22) sind parallel zueinander angeordnet und flächig aufeinander gelegt.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/52 (2006.01); B65D 73/00 (2006.01); B65D 83/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/505 (2013.01); A47G 7/085 (2013.01); B65D 73/0071 (2013.01); B65D 83/08 (2013.01); B65D 85/52 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

DE 202006006744 U1 20060706; EP 1849716 A2 20071031; EP 1849716 A3 20071114

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080515

2008-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-11-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 85/52 20060101AFI20070807BHEP

2007-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 85/50 20060101ALI20071006BHEP

2007-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 83/00 20060101ALI20071006BHEP

2007-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 73/00 20060101ALI20071006BHEP

2007-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JAHN, EBERHARD

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU