Global Patent Index - EP 1849732 A1

EP 1849732 A1 2007-10-31 - Clearance limiter for elevator car

Title (en)

Clearance limiter for elevator car

Title (de)

Spaltbegrenzer für eine Aufzugskabine

Title (fr)

Limiteur de vide pour une cabine d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 1849732 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06112959 A

Priority

EP 06112959 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to an elevator installation comprising an elevator car (2) having at least one clearance limiter (30) permanently projecting outwards from the car (2). The clearance limiter (30) partially bridges a gap (G) between the car (2) and a shaft wall (12) and therefore decreases the likelihood of service personnel falling through the gap into the shaft (10).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/0081 (2013.01); B66B 19/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 2005252726 A1 20051117 - DET FRANCK [FR], et al
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 09 4 September 2002 (2002-09-04)
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 09 30 September 1996 (1996-09-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1849732 A1 20071031

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-08-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU