Global Patent Index - EP 1849734 A1

EP 1849734 A1 2007-10-31 - Braking device for an elevator car.

Title (en)

Braking device for an elevator car.

Title (de)

Bremseinrichtung einer Aufzugskabine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de freinage pour une cabine d'ascenseur.

Publication

EP 1849734 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06113302 A

Priority

EP 06113302 A

Abstract (en)

The device (2) has a set of brake units (15) e.g. hydraulically actuated brake pistons, each with an actuating lever (16) mounted on an elevator car (5). A traveling flexible tension unit (17) e.g. wire rope, passes round an upper tension-unit reversing-sheave (18), and lower tension-unit reversing-sheave (19), and is coupled to the lever, where the sheaves are installed in upper and lower ends of a travel path of the car. A blocking device (20) breaks the tension unit at overspeed of the elevator car and activates the brake unit via the actuating lever.

Abstract (de)

Eine Bremseinrichtung (2) einer Aufzugskabine (5) mit einer an der Aufzugskabine angebrachten Bremseinheit (15), - mit einem flexiblen Zugmittel (17), das zwei Zugmittelumlenkscheiben (18, 19) umläuft, wobei ein Trum des Zugmittels sich parallel zum Fahrweg der Aufzugskabine (5) erstreckt und mit einem Betätigungselement (16) der Bremseinheit (15) und damit mit der Aufzugskabine (5) gekoppelt ist, so dass es sich Normalbetrieb synchron mit der Aufzugskabine bewegt, - mit einer Blockiervorrichtung (20), die mindestens bei Übergeschwindigkeit der Aufzugskabine (5) das Zugmittel (17) bremst, wodurch dieses über das Betätigungselement (16) die Bremseinheit (15) aktiviert, weist eine Überwachungseinrichtung (29) auf, die einen Ausfall der Kopplung zwischen dem Zugmittel (17) und der Aufzugskabine (5) detektiert.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 2511697 A 19500613 - CLIFT WILLIAM C
  • [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 360 (M - 1634) 7 July 1994 (1994-07-07)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 02 2 April 2002 (2002-04-02)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 11 26 December 1995 (1995-12-26)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1849734 A1 20071031; EP 1849734 B1 20090909; BR PI0702007 A 20071218; CN 101085661 A 20071212; CN 101085661 B 20100602; DE 502006004792 D1 20091022; EP 1849735 A1 20071031; HK 1113920 A1 20100312; KR 101343700 B1 20131220; KR 20070106466 A 20071101; US 2007221453 A1 20070927; US 7905328 B2 20110315; ZA 200703438 B 20090729

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100610

2010-03-12 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1113920

2009-10-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006004792 P 20091022

2009-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-09-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-10-17 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1113920

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080328

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU