Global Patent Index - EP 1849850 A1

EP 1849850 A1 2007-10-31 - Method of desulphurating olefin gasolines comprising at least two distinct hydrodesulphuration steps

Title (en)

Method of desulphurating olefin gasolines comprising at least two distinct hydrodesulphuration steps

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Raffination von olefinischen Benzinstoffen mit mindestens zwei verschiedenen Phasen der Hydroraffination

Title (fr)

Procédé de désulfuration d'essences oléfiniques comprenant au moins deux étapes distinctes d'hydrodésulfuration

Publication

EP 1849850 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07290436 A

Priority

FR 0603630 A

Abstract (en)

The process of producing petrol with low sulfur and mercaptans content, comprises parallely hydrodesulfurizing (HDS1 and HDS2) the petrol having a charge resulting from a catalytic cracking unit, and purifying and recycling the excess hydrogen obtained during the hydrodesulfurization. Flow of hydrogen in the hydrodesulfurization (HDS2) is lower than a flow of hydrogen in the hydrodesulfurization (HDS1). The hydrogen necessary for intervening reactions is allowed to pass through the hydrodesulfurization (HDS2) step. A purge gas of the hydrodesulfurization is passed to a purification treatment. The process of producing petrol with low sulfur and mercaptans content, comprises parallely hydrodesulfurizing (HDS1 and HDS2) the petrol having a charge resulting from a catalytic cracking unit, and purifying and recycling the excess hydrogen obtained during the hydrodesulfurization. Flow of hydrogen in the hydrodesulfurization (HDS2) is lower than a flow of hydrogen in the hydrodesulfurization (HDS1). The hydrogen necessary for intervening reactions is allowed to pass through the hydrodesulfurization (HDS2) step. A purge gas of the hydrodesulfurization is passed to a purification treatment. A ratio of the flow of hydrogen in hydrodesulfurization (HDS1 and HDS2) units to flow of charge at standard conditions is 50-1000 Nm 3>/m 3> and 30-800 Nm 3>/m 3> respectively. The charge is distilled in a light fraction corresponding to a fraction of petrol whose boiling point is lower than 100[deg] C, in a heavy fraction corresponding to a fraction of petrol whose boiling point is higher than 160[deg] C, and in a core fraction corresponding to an intermediate fraction between the light and heavy fractions. A mixture having the light fraction of petrol and intermediate fraction is treated during the hydrodesulfurization (HDS1) step in a reactor using a catalyst for producing selective hydrodesulfurization with a rate of hydrogenation (lower than 60%) of mono-olefins. The heavy fraction of petrol is treated during hydrodesulfurization (HDS2) step in a reactor using a catalyst for producing selective hydrodesulfurization with a rate of hydrogenation (lower than 90%) of mono-olefins. The charge is pre-treated to hydrogenate diolefins and mono-olefins, and to transform the light sulfur compound saturated with sulfides or heavier mercaptans to a reaction with mono-olefins. The catalyst has an amorphous and porous support, a metal, a non-metal, an average pore diameter of lower than 22 nm, and a surface density of 2x 10 -> 4> to 4x 10 -> 3>.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé d'hydrodésulfuration des coupes essences visant à produire des essences à faible teneur en soufre et en mercaptans. Ce procédé comprend au moins deux étapes d'hydrodésulfuration HDS1 et HDS2 opérées en parallèle sur deux coupes distinctes de l'essence constituant la charge. Le débit d'hydrogène dans l'étape d'hydrodésulfuration HDS2 est tel que le rapport entre le débit d'hydrogène et le débit de charge à traiter est inférieur à 80% du rapport des débits mis en oeuvre pour désulfurer dans l'étape d'hydrodésulfuration HDS1.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 65/16 (2006.01); C10G 45/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 45/02 (2013.01); C10G 2400/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1849850 A1 20071031; BR PI0701633 A 20071211; BR PI0701633 B1 20161213; CN 101294106 A 20081029; CN 101294106 B 20130327; FR 2900157 A1 20071026; FR 2900157 B1 20100924; JP 2007291392 A 20071108; JP 5448305 B2 20140319; KR 101441122 B1 20140917; KR 20070104843 A 20071029; US 2007246399 A1 20071025; US 7651606 B2 20100126

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES

2010-10-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES

2008-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080624

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080502

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU