Global Patent Index - EP 1849936 A1

EP 1849936 A1 2007-10-31 - Locking device with mobile carriage for sliding panel, corresponding blocking device and automobile.

Title (en)

Locking device with mobile carriage for sliding panel, corresponding blocking device and automobile.

Title (de)

Verschluss mit mobiler Wagenvorrichtung für Schiebeflügel, entsprechendem Abschschlussvorrichtung und Kraftfahrzeug.

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage a chariot mobile en translation pour panneau coulissant, dispositif d'obturation et véhicule automobile correspondants

Publication

EP 1849936 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07107050 A

Priority

FR 0603896 A

Abstract (en)

The device has bolts (21, 22) displaced along a locking axis to pass from an unlock state, in which the bolts permit the sliding of a sliding panel, to a lock state, in which the bolts prevent the sliding of the panel. The bolts are connected to a connection unit constituted of two cables (23, 24) which are maintained in rectilinear by guiding units (255, 256). Carriages (251, 252) are moved in translation along a displacement axis perpendicular to the locking axis. The carriages act on the connection unit to disconnect the unit and to move the bolts into the unlock state.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif de verrouillage d'un panneau coulissant (12) d'un véhicule automobile, mobile par rapport à une structure fixe (11), le dispositif comprenant au moins un pêne (21, 22) coopérant avec au moins un élément de verrouillage complémentaire prévu à cet effet sur la structure fixe, et pouvant se déplacer selon un axe de verrouillage pour passer d'un état déverrouillé permettant un coulissement du panneau coulissant à un état verrouillé dans lequel il coopère avec un des éléments de verrouillage complémentaires pour empêcher le coulissement, et vice-versa. Le dispositif de verrouillage comprend deux chariots de déverrouillage (251, 252), mobiles en translation selon un axe de décalage sensiblement perpendiculaire audit axe de verrouillage et sensiblement parallèle au plan défini par ledit panneau coulissant (12), se déplaçant dans des sens opposés et agissant sur lesdits moyens de liaison de façon à les décaler et à entraîner le passage du ou desdits pênes (21, 22) dans ledit état déverrouillé.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 1/00 (2006.01); E05B 53/00 (2006.01); E05C 1/16 (2006.01); E05B 65/08 (2006.01); E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05C 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 1/16 (2013.01); E05B 53/003 (2013.01); E05B 79/20 (2013.01); E05B 83/40 (2013.01); E05B 65/0876 (2013.01); E05B 77/00 (2013.01); E05C 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1849936 A1 20071031; EP 1849936 B1 20090114; DE 602007000477 D1 20090305; FR 2900431 A1 20071102

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091015

2009-03-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602007000477 P 20090305

2009-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2008-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080325

2008-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080222

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU