Global Patent Index - EP 1849952 A2

EP 1849952 A2 2007-10-31 - Mounting system for windows and similar

Title (en)

Mounting system for windows and similar

Title (de)

Montagesystem für Fenster und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Système de montage pour fenêtres et analogues

Publication

EP 1849952 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07008414 A

Priority

DE 102006020228 A

Abstract (en)

The mounting system (10) has an elongated metallic holder (20) fastenable at a brick-work using a bolt (22), and a fastening device. A supporting device (26) for the holder is formed such that the supporting device is fastened horizontally and vertically at intrados (28) of a wall opening (14) by the bolt. The supporting device has a side piece that is fastened at the intrados, and another side piece that runs transverse to the former side piece, where the holder is fastenable at the latter side piece.

Abstract (de)

Montagesystem (10) für Fenster (12), Türen, Bauelemente, Fassadenelemente und ähnlichem im Bereich einer Maueröffnung (14) bei einem Isoliermaterial (16), mit mindestens einem an einem Mauerwerk (18) befestigbaren langgestreckten metallischen Halter, der mit mindestens einem Bolzen (22) an dem Mauerwerk (18) befestigbar ist und eine Befestigungseinrichtung (24) für Fenster (12), Türen, Bauelemente, Fassadenelemente und ähnlichen aufweist, gekennzeichnet durch eine Trageinrichtung (26) für den Halter, die derart ausgebildet ist, dass diese Trageinrichtung (26) an der Laibung (28) der Maueröffnung (14) mittels des mindestens einen Bolzen (22) befestigbar ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/6015 (2013.01); E06B 1/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1849952 A2 20071031; EP 1849952 A3 20100127; DE 102006020228 A1 20071031

INPADOC legal status


2013-03-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120915

2012-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120504

2010-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHEMPE GMBH & CO. KG

2010-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU