Global Patent Index - EP 1849960 A2

EP 1849960 A2 2007-10-31 - Turbine blade having internal cooling passage

Title (en)

Turbine blade having internal cooling passage

Title (de)

Turbinenschaufel mit innerem Kühlkanal

Title (fr)

Aube de turbine ayant un passage interne de refroidissement

Publication

EP 1849960 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07008241 A

Priority

JP 2006122884 A

Abstract (en)

A turbine blade can be provided which enhances efficiency of a gas turbine by being efficiently cooled and has a high degree of reliability. The turbine blade includes an internal cooling passage (4,5,7a-7f), and a plurality of projections (16) on a blade ventral side wall surface and a rear side wall surface of the cooling passage on a blade trailing edge side (13) thereof or a plurality of portions (e.g., cylindrical pin fins extending from the blade trailing edge side (13) ventral side wall surface to the blade trailing edge side rear side wall surface) connecting the blade ventral side wall surface with the rear side wall surface. The projections (16) or the portions are arranged so as to have different passage resistances depending on a position on the wall surfaces on the blade trailing edge side. This reduces the necessary amount of the cooling medium while performing efficient cooling.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/18 (2006.01); F01D 5/20 (2006.01); F01D 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/187 (2013.01); F01D 5/20 (2013.01); F01D 9/041 (2013.01); F05D 2260/2212 (2013.01); F05D 2260/22141 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1849960 A2 20071031; EP 1849960 A3 20100310; JP 2007292006 A 20071108

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101210

2010-11-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2010-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2009-06-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090430

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU