Global Patent Index - EP 1850060 A1

EP 1850060 A1 2007-10-31 - Method and system of purging a natural gas reservoir for vehicles

Title (en)

Method and system of purging a natural gas reservoir for vehicles

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zur Entlüftung eines Erdgastanks für Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Procédé et système de purge d'un réservoir de GNV

Publication

EP 1850060 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07106328 A

Priority

FR 0651489 A

Abstract (en)

The system has a discharging circuit (182) connected to a flexible conduit (181) that is connected to a vent hole of a reservoir of a vehicle to be purged. A connection circuit (189) connected to the discharging circuit has a buffering capacity (131). A filling circuit has lines (183, 186) with respective sectional valves (V2, V3) between which a triggering system with two-stages (105, 106) and a compressor (107) are intercalated. A supply pipe (184) has a filling nozzle (121) to fill a reservoir of another vehicle and is connected in downstream to the discharging circuit and the line (186). An independent claim is also included for a method of purging a natural gas reservoir installed in a vehicle.

Abstract (fr)

Le système de purge d'un réservoir de GNV installé dans un premier véhicule comprend : - un premier conduit flexible (181) de raccordement à un évent (112) du réservoir du premier véhicule à purger, - un circuit de déversement (182) raccordé au premier conduit flexible (181) et comprenant des première et deuxième vannes de barrage (V1, V5), - un circuit (189) de capacité tampon raccordé au circuit de déversement (182) entre les première et deuxième vannes de barrage (V1, V5) et comprenant une troisième vanne de barrage (V4) et au moins une capacité tampon (131), - un circuit (183, 185, 186) de remplissage par compresseur qui est raccordé au premier conduit flexible (181) et comprend une quatrième vanne de barrage (V2), un système de détente (105, 106) à deux étages et un compresseur (107) placé après la quatrième vanne de barrage (V2), et - un deuxième conduit flexible (184) muni d'un pistolet de remplissage (121) pour remplir un réservoir de GNV installé dans un deuxième véhicule, lequel conduit flexible (184) est raccordé en aval à la fois du circuit de déversement (182) et du circuit (185, 186) de remplissage par compresseur.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/04 (2010.01); F17C 13/00 (2006.01); B60S 1/00 (2006.01); B67D 7/54 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 9/00 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0157 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0636 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0643 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0685 (2013.01); F17C 2205/018 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0188 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0323 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0335 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0352 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0376 (2013.01); F17C 2221/033 (2013.01); F17C 2223/036 (2013.01); F17C 2227/0157 (2013.01); F17C 2227/044 (2013.01); F17C 2227/045 (2013.01); F17C 2250/043 (2013.01); F17C 2260/044 (2013.01); F17C 2270/0168 (2013.01); F17C 2270/0176 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2766165 A1 19990122 - BRUN SA [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1850060 A1 20071031; EP 1850060 B1 20121017; FR 2900399 A1 20071102; FR 2900399 B1 20080725

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-11-14 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007026090

- Effective date: 20130718

2013-09-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130718

2012-12-13 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007026090

- Effective date: 20121213

2012-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI AND CIE SA, CH

2012-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 580085 T

- Effective date: 20121115

2012-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2011-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ

2009-03-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2008-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080602

2008-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080428

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU