Global Patent Index - EP 1850069 A1

EP 1850069 A1 2007-10-31 - Method and Control Loop for Controlling a Combustion Process

Title (en)

Method and Control Loop for Controlling a Combustion Process

Title (de)

Verfahren und Regelkreis zur Regelung eines Verbrennungsprozesses

Title (fr)

Procédé et boucle de régulation pour réguler un procédé de combustion

Publication

EP 1850069 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06008487 A

Priority

EP 06008487 A

Abstract (en)

A method includes operating in a setpoint control mode and occasionally changing over to operate in disturbance control mode. Each operation mode includes selecting actions to control adjustment devices (9) that supply air and material to the combustion by evaluation of state variables. The setpoint control mode is operated to achieve an optimal setpoint for the state variables, stability of the combustion, or any combination. The disturbance control mode is operated to approach a state in which the state variables deviates in a targeted manner within predetermined limits from the setpoint. Independent claims are included for the following: (1) control loop for regulating combustion in an installation; (2) computer readable medium having computer executable instructions.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Regelung eines Verbrennungsprozesses in einer Anlage, insbesonder einem Kraftwerk, einer Müllverbrennungsanlage oder einem Zementwerk, in welcher Gut unter Zufuhr von Luft mittels des Verbrennungsprozesses unter Ausbildung wenigstens eines Flammenkörpers umgesetzt wird, wobei die den Zustand des Systems in der Anlage beschreibenden Zustandsvariablen (s(t)) unter Verwendung wenigstens einer den Flammenkörper bildlich erfassenden Beobachtungsvorrichtung und weiterer Sensoren ermittelt und in einem Rechner bewertet werden, worauf gegebenenfalls geeignete Aktionen (a i ) auswählt werden, um Stellvorrichtungen für die Zufuhr von Gut und/oder Luft anzusteuern, wobei während einer Führungsregelung auf Soll-Werte (so) der Zustandsvariablen (s(t)) und/oder auf eine Stabilität des Verbrennungsprozesses geregelt wird, wird zeitweilig von der Führungsregelung zu einer Störungsregelung gewechselt, gemäß welcher Aktionen (a i ) auswählt werden, um Zustände des Systems in der Anlage anzufahren, bei denen die Zustandsvariablen (s(t)) innerhalb vorgegebener Grenzen (s l , s h ) gezielt vom optimalen Soll-Wert (s o ) abweichen.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/082 (2013.01); F23N 2029/20 (2013.01); F23N 2041/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1850069 A1 20071031; EP 1850069 B1 20080813; AT 404823 T 20080815; DE 502006001331 D1 20080925; ES 2313488 T3 20090301; KR 101390917 B1 20140430; KR 20070105244 A 20071030; US 2007250216 A1 20071025; US 7637735 B2 20091229

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150425

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: STEAG ENERGY SERVICES GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: STEAG POWITEC GMBH, 45128 ESSEN, DE

- Document: DE 502006001331

2017-05-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502006001331

- Representative's name: HOSENTHIEN-HELD UND DR. HELD, DE

2016-08-31 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150425

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150426

2016-05-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160526

2016-04-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: STEAG POWITEC GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: STEAG POWITEC GMBH, 45219 ESSEN, DE

- Document: DE 502006001331

2016-04-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: STEAG ENERGY SERVICES GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: STEAG POWITEC GMBH, 45219 ESSEN, DE

- Document: DE 502006001331

2016-04-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502006001331

- Representative's name: HOSENTHIEN-HELD UND DR. HELD, DE

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-02-24 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20080403017

- Effective date: 20151106

2016-01-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151106

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150425

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150425

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151231

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150425

2014-09-30 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20140418

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140424

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140416

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-08-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140325

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-08-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20130424

- Year of fee payment: 8

2013-06-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: STEAG POWITEC GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: POWITEC INTELLIGENT TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, 45219 ESSEN, DE

- Document: DE 502006001331

- Effective date: 20130424

2013-06-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: STEAG ENERGY SERVICES GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: POWITEC INTELLIGENT TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, 45219 ESSEN, DE

- Document: DE 502006001331

- Effective date: 20130424

2013-06-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502006001331

- Representative's name: HOSENTHIEN-HELD UND DR. HELD, DE

- Effective date: 20130424

2013-04-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502006001331

- Representative's name: HOSENTHIEN-HELD UND DR. HELD, DE

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080813

2011-06-30 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090214

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090425

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090425

2010-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081113

2009-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: POWITEC INTELLIGENT TECHNOLOGIES G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-07-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080813

2009-07-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090514

2009-05-29 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080813

2009-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090113

2009-05-29 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080813

2009-05-29 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080813

2009-04-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081113

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080813

2009-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080813

2009-04-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2009-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2313488 T3

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080813

2009-02-27 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080813

2009-02-27 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080813

2009-01-30 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081213

2009-01-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080813

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080813

2009-01-30 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-12-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080403017

2008-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006001331 P 20080925

2008-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2008-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-02-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND CONTROL LOOP FOR CONTROLLING A COMBUSTION PROCESS

2007-12-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071112

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU